Arthur Lee Smart v. E. Ortiz et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Smart
Defendant: E Ortiz, J. Benavidez, R Dizon and P. Bracamonte
Case Number: 3:2017cv01454
Filed: July 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re Factual Determination (Doc. No. 42 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/25/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Granting Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino for Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/15/2019.(ag) Modified on 3/19/2019 to note that all non-registered users were mailed a copy of this order (ag).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Grant 18 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2018; Replies due by 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 8/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: (1) Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Summons and Complaint. The Secretary of the CDCR, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/9/2017.(Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur Lee Smart v. E. Ortiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Benavidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Dizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Bracamonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?