Sabatini v. Price

Plaintiff: William L. Sabatini
Defendant: Thomas E. Price
Case Number: 3:2017cv01597
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L. Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Closing this Case. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/5/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
March 6, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court will grant Plaintiff one last chance to demonstrate that he is entitled to equitable tolling or to demonstrate that his Privacy Act claim is subject to the exception to the statute of limitations. Plaintiff is to limit his brief to fifteen (15) pages with limited exhibits and must be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Defendant may file a response to the brief seven (7) days after it is filed with the Court. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/6/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
February 21, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
January 16, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order without prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/16/2018. (acc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabatini v. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Price
Represented By: Kyle Hoffman
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?