Al Otro Lado, Inc. et al v. McAleenan, et al
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc., Jose Doe, Beatrice Doe, Abigail Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Emiliana Doe, Bianca Doe, Cesar Doe, Ursula Doe, Roberto Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe and Victoria Doe
Defendant: Todd C. Owen, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Chad F. Wolf and Does 1-25
Respondent: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Amicus Curiae: the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School, Kids in Need of Defense, Members of Congress, Amnesty International, State of California, Legal Services for Children, Amici Curiae, the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York and Public Counsel
Case Number: 3:2017cv02366
Filed: November 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cynthia Bashant: Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2020 re 574 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction and Temporarily Enjoin Removal of Preliminary Injunction Class Member. Court to issue order. Courts Order Granting Motion (ECF No. 576) extended pursuant to the Courts order during the hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2). (Court Reporter/ECR Dana Peabody). (Plaintiff Attorney Rebecca Cassler, Karolina Walters, Ori Lev, Melissa Crow, and Angelo Guisado). (Defendant Attorney Alexander Halaska and Katherine Shinners). (no document attached) (sxm)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 594 RESPONSE in Support re #532 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit A - Foret Decl., #3 Exhibit B - Howe Decl., #4 Exhibit C - Harris Decl., #5 Exhibit D - Buckley Decl., #6 Exhibit E - Wagner Decl.)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 593 REPLY to Response to Motion re #539 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony filed by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 592 REPLY to Response to Motion re #536 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Purported Expert Testimony (Redacted) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 591 NOTICE of Additional Exhibits [Redacted] by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #574 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction and Temporarily Enjoin Removal of Preliminary Injunction Class Member (Ex Parte) - Redacted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lev, Ori) (jmo).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 590 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #589 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lev, Ori) (anh).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 589 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lev, Ori) (anh).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 RESPONSE in Opposition re #574 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction and Temporarily Enjoin Removal of Preliminary Injunction Class Member (Ex Parte) - Redacted filed by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #586 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 586 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 RESPONSE in Opposition re #563 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 584 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #583 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Permit Remote Attendance at October 19, 2020 Hearing (ECF No. #581 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/15/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Joint MOTION to Permit Remote Attendance at October 19, 2020 Hearing by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev)(Lev, Ori) (jmo).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #579 Joint MOTION To Permit Remote Attendance At October 19, 2020 Hearing filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc. . (Lev, Ori) (jmo).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 **DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE TO WITHDRAW #580 **Joint MOTION To Permit Remote Attendance At October 19, 2020 Hearing by Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Ori Lev In Support Of Unopposed Joint Motion To Permit Remote Attendance At July 30, 2020 Hearing)(Lev, Ori)***QC mailer re: joint motion not signed by all parties.** (jmo). Modified on 10/15/2020 to withdraw document and term motion per chambers. (jmo)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Parties to File Replies In Support of Their Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony (ECF No. #571 ). Both parties shall file their respective reply briefs regarding the motions to exclude by 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/13/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER granting #572 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting #574 Emergency Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Government is temporarily restrained and enjoined from relocating Applicant outside the United States pending the Courts consideration of the issues in this action. This Order extends to Defendants and any other federal officials and personnel involved in the removal process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government shall file an Opposition to the Ex Parte Motion by October 16, 2020. A hearing on the issues raised in the Motion is set for Monday, October 19, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4B. This Order shall remain in effect until this date. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/13/2020. (BAS Chambers)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 575 NOTICE of the Parties' Continued Conferral Efforts Regarding Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Emergency Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction and Temporarily Enjoin Removal of Preliminary Injunction Class Member by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #574 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction and Temporarily Enjoin Removal of Preliminary Injunction Class Member (Ex Parte) - Redacted (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Melissa Crow)(Lev, Ori) (jmo).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction and Temporarily Enjoin Removal of Preliminary Injunction Class Member (Ex Parte) - Redacted by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rebecca M. Cassler, #3 Declaration of Nicole Ramos, #4 Declaration of Melissa Crow)(Lev, Ori) (jmo).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 **Document filed under seal at doc. no. 577 per Order #576 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #572 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lev, Ori) (anh). Modified on 10/13/2020 (anh).
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lev, Ori) (anh).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of parties' motion to exclude expert testimony by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dhruman Y. Sampat)(Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 570 RESPONSE in Opposition re #536 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Purported Expert Testimony (Redacted) filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dhruman Y. Sampat, #2 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2)(C) Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Samuel B. Cleaves, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Rodney H. Harris, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Mariza Marin)(Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 569 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #568 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sampat, Dhruman) (anh).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Sampat, Dhruman) (anh).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 RESPONSE in Opposition re #539 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 566 RESPONSE re 565 Order,,,,, (Joint Response to Docket Entry 565) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER regarding the parties' Joint Motion for Determination of June 2020 Clawback [Doc. No. 524] and documents lodged with Judge Crawford's Chambers. On August 18, 2020, the parties filed a Joint Motion requesting that the Court determine whether defendants should be allowed to claw back purportedly privileged and inadvertently produced documents. The same day, defendants lodged 17 documents, identified as documents A-Q, with Judge Crawford's Chambers for in camera review in connection with the Joint Motion. Defendants assert all 17 documents are protected by the attorney client and/or deliberative process privileges. Doc. No. 524 at 3-6, 7 n.3. Plaintiffs state in the Joint Motion that the dispute "relates only to Document K" and that for "strategic reasons" they do not challenge defendants' assertion of privilege over any of the other documents. Id. at 12 and n.5. Yet, plaintiffs also advocate for disclosure of "the documents" (plural), id. at 14, and the Court notes that among the 17 documents lodged with Chambers there are 4 identical copies of the document labeled "Document K." By the close of business on Wednesday, September 30, 2020, the parties are to file a one-page document via ECF identifying which of the 17 documents lodged with Chambers are the subject of the parties' June 2020 clawback dispute. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/29/20.(no document attached) (src)
September 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #561 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56, #59 Exhibit 57, #60 Exhibit 58, #61 Exhibit 59, #62 Exhibit 60, #63 Exhibit 61, #64 Exhibit 62, #65 Exhibit 63, #66 Exhibit 64, #67 Exhibit 65, #68 Exhibit 66, #69 Exhibit 67)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 562 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #561 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Shinners, Katherine) (anh).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Shinners, Katherine) (anh).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Ex Parte MOTION for Oral Argument re #533 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #535 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sydney Fields, re #553 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/21/2020.(rmc)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Victoria Murphy, re #552 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/21/2020.(rmc)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Allison Parr, re #551 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/21/2020.(rmc)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michelle Webster, re #550 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/21/2020.(rmc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 555 NOTICE of Filing Redacted Documents Pursuant to Dkt. 543 by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #543 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking Leave to Allow non-Electronic Filing in Support of Summary Judgment Motion (ECF No. #546 ). Plaintiffs may fileExhibit 18 to their summary judgment motion via CD-ROM and shall expeditiouslyprovide Defendants with a copy of the recording contained therein. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/14/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14504908.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fields, Sydney) (dsn)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14504898.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Murphy, Victoria)(dsn)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14504877.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Parr, Allison) (dsn)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14504864.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Webster, Michelle) (dsn)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Redacted) concerning spoliation sanctions by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock In Support Of Joint Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted) to Declaration of Stephen Madlock, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Stephen Madlock, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Stephen Madlock, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Stephen Madlock, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Stephen Madlock, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Stephen Madlock, #8 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners In Support of Joint Motion, #9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Katherine J. Shnners, #10 Exhibit B to Declaration of Katherine J. Shnners, #11 Exhibit C to Declaration of Katherine J. Shnners, #12 Exhibit D to Declaration of Katherine J. Shnners, #13 Exhibit E to Declaration of Katherine J. Shnners)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 548 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #547 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 547 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 546 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Non-Electronically by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held 9/11/20. Appearances for Plaintiffs: Stephen Medlock, Ori Lev, Angelo Guisado, Karolina Walters, Rebecca Cassler. Appearances for Defendants: Katherine Shinners, Alexander Halaska. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on 12/4/20 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel will be advised of the procedures for participating in the conference. (Status Conference set for 12/4/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.) (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Medlock). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners). (no document attached) (src)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER: (1) Overruling Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order [ECF No. #456 ]; and (2) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Seal [ECF No. #458 ]. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/10/2020. (anh) (Main Document 543 replaced on 9/10/2020 and NEF regenerated) (jmo).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #540 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion Regarding Spoliation Dispute. Good cause appearing, and in consideration of the parties' representation that the requested extension will not interfere with any scheduling order deadline, the parties' request for an extension of time is GRANTED. The parties shall file the Joint Motion Regarding Spoliation Dispute no later than September 11, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/9/2020. (no document attached) (src)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion Regarding Spoliation Dispute by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dhruman Y. Sampat)(Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Purported Expert Testimony by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dhruman Y. Sampat, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 538 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #537 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sampat, Dhruman) (anh).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Sampat, Dhruman) (anh).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Purported Expert Testimony (Redacted) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 535 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56, #59 Exhibit 57, #60 Exhibit 58, #61 Exhibit 59, #62 Exhibit 60, #63 Exhibit 61, #64 Exhibit 62, #65 Exhibit 63, #66 Exhibit 64, #67 Exhibit 65, #68 Exhibit 66, #69 Exhibit 67, #70 Exhibit 68, #71 Exhibit 69, #72 Exhibit 70, #73 Exhibit 71, #74 Exhibit 72, #75 Exhibit 73, #76 Exhibit 74, #77 Exhibit 75, #78 Exhibit 76, #79 Exhibit 77, #80 Exhibit 78, #81 Exhibit 79, #82 Exhibit 80, #83 Exhibit 81, #84 Exhibit 82, #85 Exhibit 83, #86 Exhibit 84, #87 Exhibit 85, #88 Exhibit 86, #89 Exhibit 87, #90 Exhibit 88, #91 Exhibit 89, #92 Exhibit 90, #93 Exhibit 91, #94 Exhibit 92, #95 Exhibit 93, #96 Exhibit 94, #97 Exhibit 95, #98 Exhibit 96, #99 Exhibit 97, #100 Exhibit 98, #101 Exhibit 99, #102 Exhibit 100, #103 Exhibit 101, #104 Exhibit 102, #105 Exhibit 103, #106 Exhibit 104, #107 Exhibit 105, #108 Exhibit 106, #109 Exhibit 107, #110 Exhibit 108, #111 Exhibit 109, #112 Exhibit 110, #113 Exhibit 111, #114 Exhibit 112, #115 Exhibit 113, #116 Exhibit 114, #117 Exhibit 115, #118 Exhibit 116, #119 Exhibit 117, #120 Exhibit 118, #121 Exhibit 119, #122 Exhibit 120)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 534 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #532 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 533 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #532 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 532 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 531 RESPONSE in Support re #495 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 530 RESPONSE re #510 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,,, Part 2 of Exhibits filed by Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 to Motion, #3 Exhibit Exh 3 to Motion, #4 Exhibit Exh 2 to Reply Part 1, #5 Exhibit Exh 2 to Reply Part 2, #6 Exhibit Exh 3 to Reply, #7 Exhibit Exh 4 to Reply, #8 Exhibit Exh 5 to Reply, #9 Exhibit Exh 6 to Reply)(Nazarov, Ari) **QC Mailer re documents filed untimely - due 8/21/20** (jmo).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 RESPONSE re #510 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,,, Part I of exhibits filed by Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 4 to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exh 5 to Motion, #3 Exhibit Exh 16 to Motion, #4 Exhibit Exh 17 to Motion, #5 Exhibit Exh 19 to Motion, #6 Exhibit Exh 20 to Motion, #7 Exhibit Exh 21 to Motion, #8 Exhibit Exh 22 to Motion, #9 Exhibit Exh 23 to Motion, #10 Exhibit Exh 26 to Motion, #11 Exhibit Exh 30 to Motion, #12 Exhibit Exh 31 to Motion, #13 Exhibit Exh 32 to Motion, #14 Exhibit Exh 33 to Motion, #15 Exhibit Exh 36 to Motion, #16 Exhibit Exh 37 to Motion, #17 Exhibit Exh 40 to Motion, #18 Exhibit Exh 41 to Motion, #19 Exhibit Exh 42 to Motion, #20 Exhibit Exh 43 to Motion, #21 Exhibit Exh 45 to Motion, #22 Exhibit Exh 49 to Motion, #23 Exhibit Exh 50 to Motion, #24 Exhibit Exh 51 to Motion, #25 Exhibit Exh 52 to Motion, #26 Exhibit Exh 54 to Motion, #27 Exhibit Exh 55 to Motion, #28 Exhibit Exh 56 to Motion, #29 Exhibit Exh 59 to Motion, #30 Exhibit Exh 60 to Motion, #31 Exhibit Exh 61 to Motion, #32 Exhibit Exh 62 to Motion, #33 Exhibit Exh 96 to Motion, #34 Exhibit Exh 6 to Gov Opp, #35 Exhibit Exh 7 to Gov Opp, #36 Exhibit Ex 8 to Gov Opp, #37 Exhibit Ex 9 to Gov Opp, #38 Exhibit Ex 30 to Gov Opp)(Nazarov, Ari) **QC Mailer re documents filed untimely - due 8/21/20** (jmo).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 528 RESPONSE re #510 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,,, filed by Chad F. Wolf. (Nazarov, Ari) **QC Mailer re documents filed untimely - due 8/21/20** (jmo).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Further Order Regarding Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Request for Production 220. Defendants shall produce documents to plaintiff within 7 days of the date of this order. Deadline for plaintiffs to file their anticipated motion regarding potential spoliation of evidence in hereby extended to 9/8/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/24/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Order Re: Sealing Motion (ECF No. #525 ). Defendants shall file their response by 8/27/20. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/20/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #510 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal,,,,, by Chad F. Wolf. (Nazarov, Ari) (jmo).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Joint MOTION for Determination of June 2020 Clawback Dispute by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1 (Gov't Ex. 1), #3 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #4 Exhibit 1 (Pls' Ex. 1), #5 Exhibit 2 (Pls' Ex. 2), #6 Exhibit 3 (Pls' Ex. 3), #7 Exhibit 4 (Pls' Ex. 4), #8 Exhibit 5 (Pls' Ex. 5))(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 523 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #522 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 Joint MOTION for Determination of May 2020 Clawback Dispute by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1 (Gov't Ex. 1), #3 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #4 Exhibit 1 (Pls' Ex. 1))(Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #519 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (anh).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER granting in part #517 Joint Motion to expand page limits and set briefing schedule for Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/11/2020. (jpp)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed Joint Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Expand Page Limits and to Set Briefing Schedule for Forthcoming Summary Judgment Briefing) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jpp).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 REPLY to Response to Motion re #494 MOTION to Clarify Preliminary Injunction (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Clarification of the Preliminary Injunction) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jpp).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER Granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines to Brief Discovery Disputes (Doc. No. #514 ). Deadline for the parties to submit a joint motion concerning the June 1 and June 15 privilege disputes is hereby extended to 8/18/20. Deadline for the parties to submit a joint motion regarding plaintiffs' spoliation allegations is hereby extended to 8/31/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/7/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Brief Discovery Disputes (Unopposed) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER: (1) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. #390 ); (2) Denying as Moot Defendants' Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. #411 , #425 ); and (3) Terminating as Moot the Parties' Motion to Seal (ECF No. #432 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/6/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part Motions to Seal Class Certification Motion and Opposition Brief [ECF Nos. #388 , #404 ]; and (2) Denying Without Prejudice Motion to Seal Reply Brief [ECF. No. #410 ]. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/6/2020. (anh)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Ex Parte MOTION for Oral Argument re #494 MOTION to Clarify Preliminary Injunction by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 508 RESPONSE in Opposition re #494 MOTION to Clarify Preliminary Injunction filed by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER Regarding Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Requests for Production 220 and 222; Order Granting Motion to Seal [Doc. Nos. #468 , #469 , #470 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/31/2020. (anh)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Minute entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Status conference held 7/31/20. Further telephonic status conference set for 9/11/20 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will advise as to procedures for the conference call. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than 9/8/20.(Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Medlock, Ori Lev, Karolina Walters, Angelo Guisado.) (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners, Alexander Halaska). (no document attached) (src)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cynthia Bashant: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2020 re #390 MOTION for Class Certification. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Dana Peabody). (Plaintiff Attorney Stephen Medlock, Angelo Guisado, Melissa Crow, Rebecca Cassler, Sarah Rich, and Ori Lev). (Defendant Attorney Alexander Halaska and Katherine Shinners). (no document attached) (sxm)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER Regarding Scope of 30(b)(6) Deposition; Order Granting Motion to Seal [Doc. Nos. #465 , #467 , #497 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/27/2020. (anh)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 501 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiffs' Expert After the July 24, 2020, Deadline (Doc. No. #498 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/24/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Motion Hearing) held on 7/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dana Peabody. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2020. (akr)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition from Stephanie Leutert After July 24, 2020 by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dhruman Y. Sampat)(Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf re #465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit B - Hoffman Declaration)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 496 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #495 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lev, Ori) (sxa).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Lev, Ori) (sxa).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MOTION to Clarify Preliminary Injunction by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ori Lev in Support of Motion for Clarification of the Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit 1 to Ori Lev Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Ori Lev Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Ori Lev Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Ori Lev Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Ori Lev Declaration, #8 Proposed Order)(Lev, Ori) (jmo).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER Re: Hearing. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/17/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Oral Argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. #419 ). Oral argument set for 7/30/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Cynthia Bashant in Court 4B. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/16/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 491 NOTICE of Appearance by Hayden Windrow on behalf of Does 1-25, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf (Windrow, Hayden)Attorney Hayden Windrow added to party Does 1-25(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Windrow added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Windrow added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Windrow added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Windrow added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft), Attorney Hayden Windrow added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:dft) (jmo).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - For hearing(s) on 7/2/2020 by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Lev, Ori) (jmo).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NOTICE of Determination of Privilege Dispute by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf (Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 487 NOTICE of Filing by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 486 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 489 on 7/10/2020** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #461 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (anh). Modified on 7/13/2020 (anh).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Unopposed Joint Motion to Expand Page Limits and to Extend Time for Presentation of Plaintiffs' Spoliation Motion (Doc. No. #482 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/10/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER Granting Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Raise Discovery Dispute Concerning Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production to the Court (Doc. No. #483 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/10/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Raise Potential Discovery Dispute Regarding Al Otro Lado's Responses to Defendants' Second Set of RFPs by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Spoliation Motion, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER of USCA as to #335 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. At oral argument, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the effect, if any, that East Bay Sanctuary Covenant v. Barr, Nos. 19-16487, 19-16773 (9th Cir. July 6, 2020), and Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition v. Trump, No. CV 19-2117, 2020 WL 3542481 (D.D.C. June 30, 2020), have on this case. (akr)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting #479 Motion. Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Raise Privilege Disputes to the Court (Joint Motion, Dkt. No. 479). The parties shall raise the June 1 and June 15 privilege disputes referenced in their Joint Motion by August 3, 2020, or 7 days after the District Court rules on Defendants pending Rule 72(a) objection (Dkt. No. 456), whichever is sooner. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/30/20. (no document attached) (src)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 479 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Raise Privilege Dispute by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER Granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Allow Deposition of DHS After Close of Fact Discovery (Doc. No. #471 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/26/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Discovery Hearing set for 7/2/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The Court will hear oral argument regarding pending discovery disputes(Doc. Nos. 467, 469) on 7/2/20 at 9:30 AM. The hearing shall be conducted telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/26/20.(no document attached) (src)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 6/26/2020. Further status conference set for 7/31/20 at 11:00 a.m. The Court will advise as to procedures for the conference call. Parties shall file joint status report no later than 7/27/20. (Plaintiff Attorney Karolina Walters, Ori Lev, Stephen Medlock). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners, Alexander Halaska). (no document attached) (src)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER Regarding Privilege Dispute; Order Granting Motion to Seal [Dkt. Nos. #461 #462 #463 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/26/2020. (anh)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 473 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Conference Statement by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen)(jmo).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 472 RESPONSE in Support re #458 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Joint MOTION to Allow Deposition of DHS After Close of Fact Discovery (Unopposed) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 470 REDACTION to #469 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Public Version Of Motion Dkt. 468 by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock In Support Of Joint Motion For Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Requests For Production 220 And 222, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners With Respect To Joint Motion for Determination Of Discovery Dispute Regarding Plaintiffs' Requests For Production 220 And 222, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 469 **Docketed under seal on 7/31/2020 at doc. no. 507 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #468 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh). Modified on 7/31/2020 (anh).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Scope of 30(b)(6) deposition by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit A to Shinners Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Shinners Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Shinners Decl, #5 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #6 Exhibit 1 to Medlock Decl. (Plffs' Ex. 1))(Shinners, Katherine) (mme).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 **Docketed under seal as doc. no. #502 on 7/27/2020** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Shinners, Katherine) (anh). Modified on 7/28/2020 (anh).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Shinners, Katherine) (anh).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 464 REPLY to Response to Motion re #456 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf, re #446 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Joint MOTION for Discovery - Determination of Privilege Dispute [Portions Filed Under Seal] by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 462 **Docketed Under Seal as Doc. no. 475 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #461 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Halaska, Alexander) (jmo). (anh).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Joint MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 460 REDACTION to #459 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Public version of the opposition to Dkt. No. 456 by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 **Docketed under seal at doc. no. 544 on 9/20/2020 per Order no. #543 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #458 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh). Modified on 9/10/2020 (anh).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 458 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER: the parties' Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Forthcoming Joint Motion for Determination of Privilege Dispute is GRANTED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/15/2020. (no document attached) (kxb)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 456 OBJECTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(a) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf, re #446 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, Order on Motion for Discovery . (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Rule 72(a) Objections, #2 Declaration of Dhruman Y. Sampat)(Sampat, Dhruman) (jmo). Modified on 9/10/2020 (anh).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Forthcoming Joint Motion for Determination of Privilege Dispute by Todd C. Owen, Chad F. Wolf. (Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER Granting Unopposed Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Remote Deposition Protocol (Doc. No. #450 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/13/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Raise Discovery Disputes to Court (Doc. No. #451 ). Acting Secretary Wolf is automatically substituted for former Acting Secretary McAleenan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/12/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Main Document 453 replaced on 5/13/2020) (jmo).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 5/8/2020. Further Status Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall make the necessary arrangements for the conference call. (no document attached) (kxb)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Raise Discovery Disputes to the Court (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Joint MOTION For Entry of Stipulated Remote Deposition Protocol (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) qc email re proposed order attached (dlg).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 449 RESPONSE in Support re #432 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Halaska, Alexander) 5/5/2020 (jmo).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Claw-Back Documents [Doc. No. #437 and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion to Seal [Doc. No. #435 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/30/2020. (anh)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting #444 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Contact Court re: Discovery Dispute. Defendants' deadline is extended to 5/7/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/30/2020. (no document attached) (kxb)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Raise Privilege Dispute to the Court by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER re: updated call instructions for Status Conference on 5/8/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel must call the Court's teleconference line at 1-877-873-8017, enter access code 2924630 and press * when prompted for a security code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/16/2020.(no document attached) (kxb)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. #441 ). Defendants' Response due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/16/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 REPLY to Response to Motion re #425 MOTION to Strike Anonymous Reply Declarations, #411 MOTION to Strike Declarations of Unidentified Declarants filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Deposition Protocol for the Deposition of Rule 30(B)(6) Representative Michael Humphries (ECF No. #438 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/13/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Deposition Protocol for the Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Representative Michael Humphries (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Joint MOTION for Discovery Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Clawback Notice by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Declaration of Todd Owen, #3 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C [Filed Provisionally Under Seal])(Shinners, Katherine)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 **Partially Docketed under seal at doc. no. 447 per doc no. #446 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #435 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo). (anh). Modified on 5/1/2020 (anh).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 435 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).(anh).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 434 RESPONSE in Opposition re #425 MOTION to Strike Anonymous Reply Declarations, #411 MOTION to Strike Declarations of Unidentified Declarants (Redacted) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 433 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #432 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 3/27/2020. A Status Conference is set for 5/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call and call the Court with all counsel on the line or, alternatively, provide the Court with conference call instructions. (no document attached) (kxb)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER UPDATING CONFERENCE CALL INSTRUCTIONS FOR STATUS CONFERENCE on 3/27/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call the Court's teleconference line at 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 2924630 and press * when prompted for a security code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/25/2020.(no document attached) (kxb)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STATUS REPORT (Joint) Status Conference Statement by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 428 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER: The unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Produce Privilege Log [Doc. No. 426] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/18/2020. (no document attached) (kxb)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Joint MOTION to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Produce Privilege Log (Unopposed) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit A - OMB Guidance, #3 Declaration of Scott Falk)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION to Strike Anonymous Reply Declarations by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike Reply Declarations, #2 Declaration)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 RESPONSE in Support re #410 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #388 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Kevin K. McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Nazarov, Ari) (jmo).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER Granting Unopposed Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule #422 . Plaintiffs' consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF No. #411 ) and forthcoming Motion to Strike shall be filed two weeks from the date Defendants' forthcoming Motion to Strike is filed. Defendants' consolidated Reply in Support of Motion to Strike (ECF No. #411 ) and in support of forthcoming Motion to Strike shall be filed four weeks from the date Defendants' forthcoming Motion to Strike is filed. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/13/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock in Support)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER Denying Defendant's Amended Motion to Seal (ECF No. #340 ). The Court permits redactions of the email addresses of CBP employees from the exhibits that contain them. Defendants must submit the relevant exhibits with redactions by 3/19/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/12/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER Granting Joint Motion (ECF No. #414 ) and Entering Scheduling Order. All motions, other than motions to amend or join parties, or motions in limine, shall be filed on or before 9/4/20. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/9/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Cynthia Bashant. The trial date and related deadlines (e.g. deadlines to file motions in limine and submit trial documents) will be set at the final Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/10/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Ex Parte MOTION for Oral Argument Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re #390 MOTION for Class Certification (Redacted) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER of USCA as to #335 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. We emphasize that the question whether the injunction should be overturned - the merits of the ultimate appeal - is not before this motions panel. We are ruling only on the motion to stay the injunction pending appeal... The government has not carried its burden of showing that a stay is warranted. Accordingly, we deny the motion. (This Order is for publication. See Order for full text.) (akr)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE Regarding Unsealed Documents by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Consolidate Defendants' Responses in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Seal and to Extend Deadline to Respond (ECF No. #415 ) Defendants shall file their consolidated response in supportof both Motions to Seal by 3/16/20. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/28/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Consolidate Responses in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions To Seal re #388 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal and Ecf No. 410 by Kevin K. McAleenan. (Nazarov, Ari) (jmo).
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Joint MOTION for Order (Unopposed Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 413 REPLY to Response to Motion re #390 MOTION for Class Certification (Redacted) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 412 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #410 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (anh).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION to Strike Declarations of Unidentified Declarants by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike, #2 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 410 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) Modified on 2/26/2020 QC mailer sent re filing sealed lodged proposed documents (aef).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 RESPONSE in Support re #378 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit 1 - Owen Dep. Confidentiality Designations, #3 Exhibit 2 - Howe Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 - Owen Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - Armijo Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 - Confidentiality Designations, #7 Exhibit 6 - Buckley Decl.)(Shinners, Katherine) (dlg).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting #407 Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Produce Privilege Log. Defendants shall produce any privilege log for documentsresponsive to plaintiffs First and Second Sets of Requests for Production byMarch 17, 2020. (no document attached) (kxb)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Joint MOTION to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Produce Privilege Log (Unopposed) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit 1 - Falk Declaration)(Shinners, Katherine) (dlg).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 RESPONSE in Opposition re #390 MOTION for Class Certification (Redacted) filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30)(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #404 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Nazarov, Ari) (aef).
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Nazarov, Ari) (aef).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 RESPONSE in Support re #364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs' TRO Reply Papers filed by Kevin K. McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Nazarov, Ari) (jmo).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Defendants' Deadline to File Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Class Certification Papers (ECF No. #400 ). Defendants' Response due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/31/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue Defendants' Deadline to File Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Provisional Class Certification Reply Papers (ECF No. #399 ). Defendants' Response due by 2/14/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/31/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #388 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in support of Motion to Seal (No. 378) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER re: Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Exhibit Attachment (ECF No. #396 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/24/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)(dsn)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: telephonic Status Conference held on 1/24/2020. A further telephonic Status Conference is set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Counsel for plaintiffs shall make arrangements for the conference call. The parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement no later than 3/24/2020.(Plaintiff Attorney Ori Lev, Karolina Walters, & Angelo Guisado). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners & Alexander Halaska). (no document attached) (kxb)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #390 MOTION for Class Certification (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Medlock, Stephen) QC mailer sent 1/24/2020 re wrong event. Filer directed to file a motion for the specific relief (jmo).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion to Continue Defendants' Deadline to File Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. #394 ). Responses due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/23/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dsn)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Related to TRO Reply by Kevin K. McAleenan. (Nazarov, Ari) (jmo).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Dhruman Y. Sampat on behalf of Does 1-25, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sampat, Dhruman)Attorney Dhruman Y. Sampat added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Dhruman Y. Sampat added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Dhruman Y. Sampat added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Dhruman Y. Sampat added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft) (jmo).
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Defendants' Deadline to File Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. #391 ). Defendants' Response is due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/21/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dsn)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #378 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MOTION for Class Certification (Redacted) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56, #59 Exhibit 57, #60 Exhibit 58, #61 Exhibit 59, #62 Exhibit 60, #63 Exhibit 61, #64 Exhibit 62, #65 Exhibit 63, #66 Exhibit 64, #67 Exhibit 65, #68 Exhibit 66, #69 Exhibit 67, #70 Exhibit 68, #71 Exhibit 69, #72 Exhibit 70, #73 Exhibit 71, #74 Exhibit 72, #75 Exhibit 73, #76 Exhibit 74, #77 Exhibit 75, #78 Exhibit 76, #79 Exhibit 77, #80 Exhibit 78, #81 Exhibit 79, #82 Exhibit 80, #83 Exhibit 81, #84 Exhibit 82, #85 Exhibit 83, #86 Exhibit 84, #87 Exhibit 85, #88 Exhibit 86, #89 Exhibit 87, #90 Exhibit 88, #91 Exhibit 89, #92 Exhibit 90, #93 Exhibit 91, #94 Exhibit 92, #95 Exhibit 93, #96 Exhibit 94, #97 Exhibit 95, #98 Exhibit 96, #99 Exhibit 97, #100 Exhibit 98, #101 Exhibit 99, #102 Exhibit 100, #103 Exhibit 101, #104 Exhibit 102, #105 Exhibit 103)(Medlock, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2020 (jmo). (Attachment 85 replaced on 1/24/2020 per order)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 389 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #388 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen)(aef).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (aef).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Leave to File Additional Pages in Class Certification Briefing and to Set Briefing Schedule (ECF No. #384 ). Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and accompanying Memorandum of Points and Authorities due 1/14/2020. Defendant's opposition due 2/12/2020. Plaintiff's reply due 2/26/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/14/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dsn)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Defendant's Deadline to File Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (ECF No. #385 ). Defendants' response is due 1/27/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/13/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dsn)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Support of Sealing Limited Portion of Pls' TRO Reply Papers by Kevin K. McAleenan. (Nazarov, Ari) (dlg).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Class Certification Briefing and to set Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 383 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by DOES. (Nazarov, Ari)Attorney Ari Nazarov added to party DOES(pty:res) (jmo).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER (1) Granting Defendants' Motion to Amend/Correct (ECF No. #362 ); and (2) Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order without Prejudice (ECF No. #344 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/6/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dsn)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 RESPONSE in Support re #350 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Table of Confidentiality Designations for Deposition Transcript)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion re #352 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Provisional Class Certification) (Redacted) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #378 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Defendants' Counsel of Record (ECF No. #375 ). Attorney Sairah G. Saeed terminated. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/3/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 RESPONSE in Opposition re #352 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Provisional Class Certification) filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sairah G. Saeed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Saeed, Sairah) (jmo).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER of USCA as to #335 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. Defendants-Appellants' Unopposed Motion for an extension of time to file opening brief and excerpts of record and to adjust the briefing schedule is granted. Briefing schedule issued. (akr)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 REPLY to Response to Motion re #336 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #330 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Saeed, Sairah) (jmo).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen re #371 Response in Support of Motion (Saeed, Sairah)(jmo).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ***WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #372 RESPONSE in Support re #336 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #330 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Saeed, Sairah) Modified on 12/30/2019 to withdraw document. (jmo)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 RESPONSE in Support re #342 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saeed, Sairah) (jmo).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER of USCA as to #335 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. The government requests an emergency temporary stay of the USDC's order provisionally certifying a class, and preliminarily enjoining the government from enforcing the Third Country Transit Rule, 8 C.F.R. 208.13(c)(4), against non-Mexican nationals who were allegedly in the process of arriving at a port of entry before the Third Country Transit Rule went into effect. The government also seeks a stay of the USDC's order pending appeal. A temporary stay in this context (sometimes referred to as an administrative stay) is only intended to preserve the status quo until the substantive motion for a stay pending appeal can be considered on the merits, and does not constitute in any way a decision as to the merits of the motion for stay pending appeal. Because granting the stay request would preserve the status quo, we grant the government's motion for a temporary stay to preserve the status quo pending a decision on the motion for stay pending appeal. The Third Country Transit Rule has been in effect since July 16, 2019. Prohibiting the government from applying the Rule to the proposed class members could cause complications at the border in the period before the motion for stay pending appeal is decided. Our ruling is based on these considerations and not in any respect on the merits of the dispute. Instructions issued. This case will be assigned to the next available oral argument panel for a decision on the merits of the appeal. (akr)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 REPLY to Response to Motion re #344 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted) (Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Prohibiting Application of Asylum Cooperative Agreement Rule to Provisional Class Members - Redacted) filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER denying #356 Motion to Suspend the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjt)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting #363 Joint MOTION to Partially Modify September 9, 2019 Order re #288 Order on Motion to Compel. Defendants' request to continue the deadline for production of their privilege log to 2/18/2020 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/20/2019. (no document attached) (kxb)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Joint MOTION to Partially Modify September 9, 2019 Order re #288 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, to extend time to produce privilege log (unopposed) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners)(Shinners, Katherine) (jmo).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MOTION to Amend/Correct #357 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Unopposed) by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Michael Ringler (Dec. 19, 2019), #3 Declaration of Todd Hoffman (Dec. 19, 2019))(Halaska, Alexander) (jmo).
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 RESPONSE in Opposition re #336 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #330 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen) (jmo).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Forbes on behalf of Kids in Need of Defense, Legal Services for Children, Public Counsel, the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York, the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School (Forbes, Matthew)Attorney Matthew D. Forbes added to party Kids in Need of Defense(pty:am), Attorney Matthew D. Forbes added to party Legal Services for Children(pty:am), Attorney Matthew D. Forbes added to party Public Counsel(pty:am), Attorney Matthew D. Forbes added to party the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York(pty:am), Attorney Matthew D. Forbes added to party the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School(pty:am) (jmo).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Meryl Holt as Counsel by Kids in Need of Defense, Legal Services for Children, Public Counsel, the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York, the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School (Holt, Meryl) (jmo).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #356 Ex Parte MOTION re #336 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #330 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saeed, Sairah) (jmo).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Redacted RESPONSE in Opposition re #344 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Halaska, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Ex Parte MOTION to Suspend the Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay re #336 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #330 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev)(Marmolejo, Matthew). Modified on 12/18/2019 - Edited text (jah).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: telephonic Status Conference held on 12/12/2019. A further telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/24/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.) Counsel for plaintiffs shall make arrangements for the conference call. (Plaintiff Attorney Steven Medlock, Ori Lev, Karolina Walters & Melissa Crow). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners & Sairah Saeed). (no document attached) (kxb)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Filing with the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Saeed, Sairah)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #345 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Briefing Schedule re #344 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants' Opposition due by 12/17/2019. Plaintiffs' reply due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Provisional Class Certification) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Medlock, Stephen)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #350 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 RESPONSE in Opposition re #345 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). Modified on 12/11/2019 - Edited text to match pleading (jah).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER of USCA as to #335 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. The appeal filed December 4, 2019 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. Time schedule issued. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (akr)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE of Docketing Error: Exhibits to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #344 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16, #7 Exhibit 17, #8 Exhibit 18, #9 Exhibit 19, #10 Exhibit 20, #11 Exhibit 21)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER denying Defendants' #337 Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' #336 Motion to Stay. Court sets hearing on the Motion to Stay for 1/3/2020. The hearing date is solely for the purpose of setting the briefing schedule. The schedule for filing the Opposition and Reply must comply with Civil Local Rule 7.1(e). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/6/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for their Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Prohibiting Application of Asylum Cooperative Agreement Rule to Provisional Class Members by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted) by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Melissa Crow, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Medlock, Stephen)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #342 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 NOTICE of Compliance with the Courts Order by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #332 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Amended MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Saeed, Sairah) (aef).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #337 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' #336 Motion to Stay filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew H. Marmolejo)(Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 USCA Case Number 19-56417 for #335 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (akr)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Ex Parte MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendants' #336 Motion to Stay by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel)(Shinners, Katherine). Modified on 12/5/2019 - Edited text (jah).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #330 Order on Motion to Certify Class Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Shinners, Katherine). (jah). **QC Mailer sent on 3/16/2020 to withdraw motion per chambers (jmo).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to #330 Order by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. Fee Waived. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (Shinners, Katherine). (Modified on 12/4/2019: Edited docket text re linked Order.) (akr).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Due to technical difficulties, defendants have requested a brief extension of time from 12/3/2019 to 12/20/19 to complete the production of the remaining responsive, non-privileged documents from Custodian Higgins. [Doc. 333, at pp. 2-5.] Plaintiffs have not taken any position on this request. [Doc. No. 333, at p. 5.] Defendants' request is GRANTED. [Doc. No. 333.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/4/2019. (no document attached) (plh)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Joint MOTION to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Complete Document Production from Custodian Higgerson by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners)(Shinners, Katherine)(jrm).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Motions to Seal ( #290 , #305 , #311 , #314 ). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/21/19. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Nazarov on behalf of Kevin K. McAleenan (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nazarov, Ari).Attorney Ari Nazarov added to party Kevin K. McAleenan (pty:dft). Modified on 11/20/2019 - Edited text (jah).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #293 Motion for Provisional Class Certification; granting Plaintiffs' #294 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court provisionally certifies a class consisting of "all non-Mexican asylum-seekers who were unable to make a direct asylum claim at a U.S. Port of Entry (POE) before 7/16/2019 because of the U.S. Governments metering policy, and who continue to seek access to the U.S. asylum process". Court grants Plaintiffs' #294 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and orders that Defendants are enjoined from applying the Asylum Ban to members of the aforementioned provisionally certified class and ordered to return to the pre-Asylum Ban practices for processing the asylum applications of members of the certified class. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/19/2019. ( All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 11/5/2019 before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dana Peabody. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 12/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020. (akr)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting [Doc. No. 326], Joint Motion to Partially Modify Doc. No. 288, Order on Motion to Compel, entered 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/15/2019. (no document attached) (kxb)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 11/15/2019. Further Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall make necessary arrangements for the conference call. (Plaintiff Attorney Steve Medlock, Sarah Rich, Karolina Walters, & Angelo Guisado, Erika Pinheiro, Nicole Ramos & Nora Phillips). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners, Alexander Halaska, Sairah Saeed & David White). (no document attached) (kxb)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Joint MOTION to Partially Modify September 9, 2019 Order re #288 Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, (unopposed) by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit Cole Declaration)(Shinners, Katherine)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The telephonic Status Conference on 11/15/2019 is moved from 2:00 p.m. to 10:30 a.m. (no document attached) (kxb)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to a conflict involving the Court's calendar, the Status Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 11:30 a.m. is continued to 2:00 p.m. (no document attached) (kxb)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #318 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Catherine Bauer terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/5/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cynthia Bashant: Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2019 re #294 Redacted MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #293 Redacted MOTION to Provisionally Certify Class. Motions submitted. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Dana Peabody). (Plaintiff Attorney Baher Azmy, Melissa Crow, Stephen Medlock and Rebecca Cassler). (Defendant Attorney Scott Stewart and Alexander Halaska). (no document attached) (sxm)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen (Stewart, Scott)Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Grant Stewart added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER: The Court adopts and enters as an Order, the deadlines and conditions set forth in the Jointly Proposed Schedule regarding Defendants Additional Custodians. [Doc. No. 319.] Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/31/2019.(no document attached) (kxb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Joint Proposed Schedule Regarding Defendants' Additional Custodians re #304 Order on Motion to Compel by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Shinners, Katherine). Modified on 10/31/2019 - Pdf is not a Motion. QC Email sent. Motion and judge association termed (jah)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Bauer by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Setting Oral Argument re #294 . Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Any request to continue oral argument shall be made at least 7 days in advance of the hearing and preferably be made as a joint request.Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/23/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Redacted REPLY to Response to Motion re #293 Redacted MOTION to Provisionally Certify Class filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #314 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (dlg).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Redacted REPLY to Response to Motion re #294 Redacted MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Medlock, Stephen). Modified on 10/21/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected entry (jah).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #311 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (rmc).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (rmc).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #309 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess Page Limit. Plaintiffs may file a reply brief in support their Motion for Preliminary Injunction not to exceed 13 pages. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/17/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Excess Page Limit re #294 Redacted Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Medlock, Stephen). Modified on 10/17/2019 - Edited docket entry and added document link (jah).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 RESPONSE in Opposition re #293 Redacted MOTION to Provisionally Certify Class filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Shinners, Katherine). (jah).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Redacted RESPONSE in Opposition re #294 Redacted MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska (Oct. 10, 2019), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Halaska, Alexander). Modified on 10/11/2019 - Edited to reflect as redacted (jah).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #305 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (rmc).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Halaska, Alexander) (rmc).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER Re: #286 Joint Motion Regarding Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Limited Class-Wide Discovery. Plaintiffs' Motion is granted. Counsel are to promptly meet and confer regarding the timeframe for defendants' production of documents from the custodians for the El Paso, Brownsville, Nogales and Calexico ports of entry (POEs) and to jointly submit a proposed schedule for Court's approval by 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/9/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Telephonic Status Conference held. With good cause appearing, the parties Joint Motion to Partially Modify the September 9, 2019 Order [Doc. No. 302] is GRANTED. Defendants shall produce all responsive, non-privileged documents from custodians Randy Howe, Todd Hoffman, Todd Owen, Carlos Rodriguez, and Sidney Aki by October 25, 2019. A telephonic Status Conference is set for November 15, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall make arrangements for the conference call and either initiate the conference call to the Court's chambers or provide the Court with call-in instructions. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be lodged with the Courts chambers by November 8, 2019. The Joint Status Conference Statement can be lodged via email at efile_crawford@casd.uscourts.gov. (Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Marmolejo, Stephen Medlock, Rebecca Cassler, Karolina Walters, & Angelo Guisado).(Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners, Alexander Halaska & Sairah Saeed). (no document attached) (kxb)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Joint MOTION to Partially Modify September 9, 2019 Order re #288 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #2 Exhibit (1) Falk Declaration, #3 Exhibit (2) Active Learning Protocol)(Shinners, Katherine). (jah).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #300 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Lodge Supplemental Evidence. Plaintiffs supplemental evidence shall be consideredevidence in support of #294 Redacted Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/3/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Lodge Supplemental Evidence by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' #295 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Provisional Class Certification.. Reply remains due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/30/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 RESPONSE in Opposition re #295 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Provisional Class Certification filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 RESPONSE in Support re #290 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randy Howe (Sept. 26, 2019), #2 Declaration of Rodney H. Harris (Sept. 26, 2019))(Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 NOTICE of Error by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen re #291 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska (Sept. 26, 2019) (Corrected))(Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Regarding Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Provisional Class Certification by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Redacted MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Melissa Crow, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41 (Filed Under Seal), #44 Exhibit 42 (Filed Under Seal), #45 Exhibit 43 (Filed Under Seal), #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Redacted MOTION to Provisionally Certify Class by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27 (Filed Under Seal), #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46)(Medlock, Stephen). Modified on 9/27/2019 - Edited text (jah).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #290 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (aef).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE of Intent to Respond by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen re #290 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander J. Halaska (Sept. 26, 2019))(Halaska, Alexander). Modified on 9/27/2019 - Edited text (jah).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Medlock, Stephen) (aef).
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: A telephonic Status Conference is set for October 8, 2019, at 1:30 p.m.Plaintiffs' counsel shall make arrangements for the conference call and either initiate the conference call to the Court's chambers or provide the Court with call-in instructions. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be lodged with the Courts chambers by October 4, 2019. The Joint Status Conference Statement can be lodged via email at efile_crawford@casd.uscourts.gov.(no document attached) (kxb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #284 Joint Motion to Compel Defendant's Production of Documents; granting #285 Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. Defendant shall produce all responsive, non-privileged document from custodians Randy Howe, Todd Hoffman, Todd Owen, Carlos Rodrigues, and Sidney Aki by 10/8/2019. Defendant shall produce all responsive, non-privileged documents from all agreed-upon non-custodial sources by 10/23/2019. Defendant shall produce all responsive, non-privileged documents from all remaining agreed-upon or Court-ordered custodians by 11/19/2019. Defendant shall produce any privilege log for documents responsive to plaintiff's First and Second Sets of Requests for Production by 12/20;2019. The deadline for the filing of plaintiff's motion for class certification is 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/9/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/6/2019.(Plaintiff Attorneys Steve Medlock, Ori Lev, Matthew Fenn, Melissa Crow, Baher Azmy, Angelo Guisado, Erika Pinheiro, Nicole Ramos & Nora Phillips). (Defendant Attorneys Katherine Shinners & Alexander Halaska). (no document attached) (kxb)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Joint MOTION to Compel Limited Class-Wide Discovery by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Joint MOTION to Compel Defendants' Timely Production of Documents by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen M. Medlock, #2 Declaration of Katherine J. Shinners, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Medlock, Stephen). (jah).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ANSWER to #189 Second Amended Complaint, by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, Kirstjen Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum from Todd C. Owen (Apr. 27, 2018))(Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #281 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Court approves then withdrawal. Attorney Micah D. Stein withdrawn as counsel of record for the Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/15/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Micah D. Stein in Support)(Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #192 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Court grants Defendants' motion as follows: 1.) Court dismisses without leave to amend the Section 706(1) claims of the New Individual Plaintiffs for alleged failures to take agency action required by 8 USC 1225(b)(2)(A) and 2.) Court dismisses with prejudice Organizational Plaintiff Al Otro Lado's Alien Tort Statute (ATS) claim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Court otherwise denies Defendants' motion to dismisss the Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer to the Second Amended Complaint by 8/16/2019. The Court withdraws the previously docketed 7/29/2019 order (ECF No. #278 ) and replaces it with this Amended Order. Because the Amended Order is substantively the same, the Court does not alter any deadlines. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/2/2019.(jrm) (jao).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER: Denying Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute [Doc. No. #263 ]; Denying Joint Motion to Strike Exhibits 5 & 6 of Westwater Declaration [Doc. No. #268 ]; & Directing Counsel to Further Meet and Confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (jao).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #192 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Court grants Defendants' motion as follows: 1.) Court dismisses without leave to amend the Section 706(1) claims of the New Individual Plaintiffs for alleged failures to take agency action required by 8 USC 1225(b)(2)(A) and 2.) Court dismisses with prejudice Organizational Plaintiff Al Otro Lado's Alien Tort Statute (ATS) claim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Court otherwise denies Defendants' motion to dismisss the Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer to the Second Amended Complaint by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI). After conferring on the matters, the Parties proposed to the Court terms, which are adopted and entered as the Order governing production of electronic discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Main Document 277 replaced on 7/18/2019). Modified on 7/18/2019 - Wrong pdf attached. Corrected image and regenerated NEF (jah).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Following Status Conference and Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Status Conference was held on 7/12/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/5/2019 is continued to 9/6/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. At the conclusion of the ENE, Court will conduct a Status Conference. Prior to the ENE and Status Conference and by 8/30/2019, the parties shall file a joint motion in which they propose an amended schedule for filing plaintiff's motion for class certification and related discovery deadlines. The parties shall lodge a Joint Status Conference Statement with Chambers by 8/30/2019. The parties shall submit confidential ENE statements of 5 pages or less by 8/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/12/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 7/12/2019.(no document attached) (kxb)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew H. Marmolejo (Marmolejo, Matthew). Modified on 7/9/2019 - Notice is for different atty, not filer. QC Email sent for Atty Crow to update address on docket per ECF 1.f (jah).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #251 Joint Motion for Entry of ESI and Protective Order. The parties shall lodge by email with Chambers a stipulated ESI Order and stipulated Protective Order by 7/12/2019. The proposed Orders shall be in a word-processing editable format (Word or Wordperfect). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 7/2/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #270 Motion to Authorize General Public Access to the Electronic Docket. The Clerk shall remove any restrictions that impede the ability of the general public to electronically access the docket in this case, including any restrictions imposed under FRCP 5.2(c) as a result of Plaintiffs' initial designation as an immigration case. Court advises the parties that filings made after this Order will not be subject to the electronic access restriction. The Court's staff is working on ensuring that filings made before the issuance of this Order are electronically accessible to the general public. Nothing has prohibited or prohibits counsel from disseminating to the general public any filings not otherwise under seal. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/28/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Unopposed MOTION to Allow Remote Docket Access by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Following Status Conference. Telephonic Status Conference was held on 6/7/2019. As discussed with counsel, Court is concerned with the pace of defendants' engagement in discovery, including specifically document production. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/12/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/7/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Joint MOTION to Strike Exhibits 5 and 6 of Gisela Westwater Declaration by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev, #2 Declaration of Gisela Westwater)(Marmolejo, Matthew). Modified on 6/10/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected event and text (jah).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held on 6/7/2019.(Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Marmolejo, Stephen Medlock, Melissa Crow, Karolina Walters, Angelo Guisado & Ori Levi). (Defendant Attorney Katherine Shinners & Alexander Halaska). (no document attached) (kxb)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Joint STATUS REPORT by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #262 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robin Kelley; Faraz R. Mohammadi; Manuel A. Abascal and Wayne S Flick and Michaela R. Waird of Latham & Watkins LLP as counsel of record for all Individual Plaintiffs terminated. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/28/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD re #261 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Yamileth G. Davila terminated. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/28/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev, #2 Exhibit 1 to Lev Declaration, #3 Declaration of Gisela A. Westwater, #4 Exhibit 1 to Westwater Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Westwater Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Westwater Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Westwater Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Westwater Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Westwater Declaration)(Marmolejo, Matthew) (sjm).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Faraz Mohammadi)(Abascal, Manuel) (sjm).
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendants by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel)(Davila, Yamileth) (sjm).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 5/10/2019 before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dana Peabody. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cynthia Bashant: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2019 re #251 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and ESI Order filed and #192 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion submitted. Court to issue order.(Court Reporter/ECR Dana Peabody). (Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Marmolejo, Baher Azmy, Melissa Crow, Sarah Rich and Rebecca Cassler). (Defendant Attorney Gisela Westwater and Alexader Halaksa). (no document attached) (sxm)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Marmolejo on behalf of Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe (Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE of Filing of Redline of Second Amended Complaint by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe re #189 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Requesting Redline re #189 Second Amended Complaint, filed by Emiliana Doe, Maria Doe, Bianca Doe, Dinora Doe, Abigail Doe, Cesar Doe, Victoria Doe, Ingrid Doe, Al Otro Lado, Inc., Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Roberto Doe, Juan Doe, Ursula Doe. Plaintiffs are ordered to file a redline of the Second Amended Complaint relative to the original complaint by 5/3/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/1/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #254 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Matthew H. Marmolejo substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc. (AOL). Attorneys Robin Kelley, Michaela R. Laird, Faraz R. Mohammadi, Manuel A. Abascal and Wayne S Flick are terminated as counsel for Plaintiff AOL. This does not affect their appearance as counsel of record for any other Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/25/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Amended MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Abascal, Manuel). (jah).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER denying Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.'s #252 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Court finds that the present motion is not proper as to the listed attorneys. Court denies the motion without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling a proper motion that cures the deficiency. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Al Otro Lado, Inc. (Abascal, Manuel). Modified on 4/17/2019 - Wrong event, should be Motion. QC Email sent. Changed to Motion (jah).
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and ESI Order by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ori Lev, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ori Lev, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ori Lev, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ori Lev, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Ori Lev, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Ori Lev, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Ori Lev, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Ori Lev, #10 Declaration of Gisela A. Westwater)(Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER denying Defendants' #247 Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production. Although defendants' request for an extension of time is now moot, Court is compelled to address Defendants' flagrant violation of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, Civil Local Rules and the undersigned's Chambers Rules. Court cautions counsel, that any further deviance from the Chambers Rules, Civil Local Rules or Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will likely result in the offending motion or brief being rejected for filing and the possible imposition of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, Kirstjen Nielsen re #247 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second RFPs filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition re #247 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second RFPs filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 *** WITHDRAWN BY FILER PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT #249 *** Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second RFPs by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gisela A. Westwater, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Stephen M. Medlock to Gisela A. Westwater (Feb. 19, 2019), #3 Exhibit 2 - Pls.' Second Set of RFPs to All Defendants, #4 Exhibit 3 - Emails Between Alexander J. Halaska, Matthew M. Marmolejo, and Stephen M. Medlock (Mar. 20-Apr. 8, 2019), #5 Exhibit 4 - Email from Stephen M. Medlock to Alexander J. Halaska (Apr. 8, 2019))(Halaska, Alexander). (jah). Modified on 4/11/2019 - Motion and judge association termed (jah).
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Order Following Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference was held on 3/22/2019. Defendant shall produce organizational charts for DHS and CBP by 3/29/2019. The parties shall file a joint motion for protective order and order regarding ESI by 4/12/2019. Deadline to file motion to add new parties is 4/15/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/7/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Status Conference Statement shall be lodged with Court's Chambers by 5/31/2019. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/5/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Deadline for filing of plaintiff's motion for class certification is 11/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #241 Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Oral Argument re #192 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Oral Argument set for 5/10/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Case Management Conference held on 3/22/2019.(Plaintiff Attorneys Ori Lev, Matthew Marmelejo, Stephen Medlock, Sarah Rich, Rebecca Cassler, Karolina Walters, & Angelo Guisado). (Defendant Attorney Gisela Westwater, Sophie Kaiser, Alexander Halaska & Siarah Saeed). (no document attached) (kxb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Supplemental JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN re #239 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe (Marmolejo, Matthew). Modified on 3/21/2019 - Removed duplicate added text (jah).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to a conflict involving the Court's calendar, the Case Management Conference ("CMC") on 3/22/19 is moved from 9:30 a.m. to 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall appear telephonically. Plaintiffs' counsel shall make arrangements for the conference call and initiate the conference call to the Court's chambers.(no document attached) (kxb)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Ex Parte Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument by Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev)(Marmolejo, Matthew). (jah).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to a conflict involving the Court's calendar, the Case Management Conference ("CMC") set for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is continued to 3/22/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel shall appear telephonically. Plaintiffs' counsel shall make arrangements for the conference call and initiate the conference call to the Court's chambers. (no document attached) (kxb)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Plaintiffs. (Marmolejo, Matthew). Modified on 3/11/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected text to match pleading (jah).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER denying Plaintiff Al Otro Lado's #227 Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Discovery. This Order is Al Otro Lado's (AOL) request to conduct the discovery on an expedited basis. Court makes no findings regarding whether the requested discovery is appropriate under the standard timing requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/6/2019. (jah)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re #227 Joint MOTION to Expedite Joint Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Marmolejo, Matthew). Modified on 3/5/2019 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected entry (jah).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexandra Hiatt (Re: Doc. No. #218 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/26/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jamie Stephen Dycus (Re: Doc. No. #217 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/26/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #227 Joint MOTION for Expedited Discovery filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sairah G. Saeed, #2 Declaration Pete R. Acosta, #3 Exhibit A)(Saeed, Sairah). Modified on 2/28/2019 - Edited text (jah).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Order Setting Deadlines as to #227 Plaintiff's "Joint Motion Regarding Plaintiff Al Otro Lado Inc.'s Request for Expedited Discovery." Thus far the Court has only received a response from Defendant opposing the procedural format and timing of the filing of Plaintiff's motion #228 . If Defendant intends to file a brief responding to the substance of Plaintiff's motion, it shall do so no later than 2/28/2019. Any reply brief shall be filed by 3/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/27/19.(no document attached) (kxb)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REPLY to Response to Motion re #227 Joint MOTION to Expedite Joint Motion Regarding Plaintiff Al Otro Lado Inc.'s Request for Expedited Discovery filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Erika Pinheiro)(Marmolejo, Matthew) (acc).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #229 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants reply brief in support of their partial motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall not exceed 21 pages. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/26/2019. (sjm)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Defendants' Forthcoming Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander) (acc).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #227 Joint MOTION to Expedite Joint Motion Regarding Plaintiff Al Otro Lado Inc.'s Request for Expedited Discovery filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Saeed, Sairah) (acc).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Joint MOTION for Expedited Discovery by Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ori Lev in Support of Joint Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 - ISO Mot. Expedited Discovery - Phillips Decl. - Final - With Attachments, #3 Exhibit 2 - ISO Mot. Expedited Dicovery - Ramos Decl. - Final, #4 Exhibit 3 - ISO Mot. Expedite Discovery - Pinheiro Decl. - Final, #5 Exhibit 4 - ISO Mot. Expedited Discovery -RFPs, #6 Exhibit 5 - ISO Mot. Expedited Discovery - 30.b.6 Notice, #7 Exhibit 6 - ISO Mot Expedited Discovery)(Marmolejo, Matthew) (ag). Modified on 3/5/2019 - Corrected motion text. Motion referred (jah).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Granting #215 , #216 , #219 , #221 , #223 , and #225 Motions for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MOTION for Leave to File / Unopposed Motion of Kids in Need of Defense, et al., to File a Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Kids in Need of Defense, Legal Services for Children, Public Counsel, the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York, the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brief of Amici Curiae Kids in Need of Defense, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Holt, Meryl) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance of Amici Curiae Kids in Need of Defense, et al. by Meryl Holt on behalf of Kids in Need of Defense, the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York, Legal Services for Children, Public Counsel, the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School (Holt, Meryl)Attorney Meryl Holt added to party Kids in Need of Defense(pty:am), Attorney Meryl Holt added to party the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York(pty:am), Attorney Meryl Holt added to party Legal Services for Children(pty:am), Attorney Meryl Holt added to party Public Counsel(pty:am), Attorney Meryl Holt added to party the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School(pty:am) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief by Amici Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service)(Kibler, Michael) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by Michael D Kibler on behalf of Amici Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kibler, Michael) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Amici Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Opp. to Defendants' Motion to Partially Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint)(Manning, Susan) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Baker Manning on behalf of Amici Curiae (Manning, Susan)Attorney Susan Baker Manning added to party Amici Curiae(pty:am) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Members of Congress in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by Members of Congress. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(Benedetto, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Donald Benedetto added to party Members of Congress(pty:am) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12226568.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hiatt, Alexandra) (mdc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12226543.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dycus, Jamie) (mdc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Amnesty International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae Amnesty International in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Leader, Susan)Attorney Susan K. Leader added to party Amnesty International(pty:am) (ag).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the States of California, Connecticut, the District of Columbia, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit States' Amicus Brief)(Zahradka, James)Attorney James Fred Zahradka, II added to party State of California(pty:am) (ag).
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Micah D. Stein, re #208 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Stephen M. Medlock, re #207 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ori Lev, re #206 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Matthew E. Fenn, re #205 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 210 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Abascal, Manuel). (jah).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Substitution of Attorney Katherine J. Shinners for Attorney Genevieve M. Kelly by Katherine J Shinners on behalf of Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen (Shinners, Katherine)Attorney Katherine J Shinners added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine J Shinners added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine J Shinners added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine J Shinners added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12179225.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Stein, Micah) (mdc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12174176 - See 17cv2355-MMA-KSC, #15.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Medlock, Stephen) Modified text on 2/7/2019 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12173535.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lev, Ori) (mdc)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12171447 - paid on 2/6/2019)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Fenn, Matthew)(Modified on 2/6/2019 to add receipt information.)(jrd)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Marmolejo on behalf of Al Otro Lado, Inc. (Marmolejo, Matthew)Attorney Matthew H. Marmolejo added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Resetting Case Management Conference and Related Dates. A Joint Discovery Plan is due on or before 3/8/2019. Counsel shall appear telephonically on 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for a Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/30/2019.(ag)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER LIFTING STAY. As indicated in Court's 1/8/2019 Order granting Defendants' request to stay case during the lapse in appropriations #201 , the stay will be automatically lifted when appropriations are restored. Because appropriations have been restored, the stay of this action is lifted. The remaining deadlines #191 are extended on Defendants' #192 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff may file opposition by 2/14/2019. Defendants may file reply by 3/7/2019. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/28/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion for Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations (ECF No. #198 ). The stay will be lifted automatically when appropriations are restored. Further, in the event of a protracted lapse in appropriations, the Court will consider a request by Plaintiffs to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re #198 MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse in Appropriations filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander) (jdt).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re #198 MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse in Appropriations filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Abascal, Manuel) (acc).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION to Stay Case in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saeed, Sairah) QC re: proposed order (acc).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD re: #194 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathryn E Shepherd terminated. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/2/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting #193 Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Stay on Discovery & Setting Case Management Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Crawford on or before 1/25/2019. Counsel shall appear telephonically on 2/1/2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Crawford for a Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing, re #194 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Emiliana Doe, Maria Doe, Bianca Doe, Dinora Doe, Abigail Doe, Cesar Doe, Jose Doe, Victoria Doe, Ingrid Doe, Al Otro Lado, Inc., Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Roberto Doe, Juan Doe, Ursula Doe. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Withdraw Kathryn E. Shepherd as Attorney by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathryn E. Shepherd) (jah)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Joint MOTION to Stay Regarding Discovery Status by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sairah G. Saeed, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service)(Abascal, Manuel) (sjm).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Does 1-25, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Halaska, Alexander)Attorney Alexander James Halaska added to party Does 1-25(pty:dft) (sjm).
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Joint Motion to Set Schedule for defendants to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint re #189 Second Amended Complaint. Defendants Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen and Todd C. Owen may answer to the Second Amended Complaint (SAC) by 11/29/2018. If Defendants respond to the Second Amended Complaint by moving to dismiss, such motion shall not exceed 35 pages. If Defendants respond to the SAC by moving to dismiss, Plaintiffs may file an opposition to such motion by 1/11/2019, opposition shall not exceed 35 pages. If Defendants respond to the SAC by moving to dismiss, they may file a reply in support by 2/1/2019, reply shall not exceed 15 pages. An untimely extension request will be summarily denied by reference to this Order. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Abascal, Manuel). (jah).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1-25, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, filed by Bianca Doe, Roberto Doe, Abigail Doe, Al Otro Lado, Inc., Victoria Doe, Ingrid Doe, Cesar Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Maria Doe, Ursula Doe, Emiliana Doe, Dinora Doe, Juan Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Abascal, Manuel). Modified on 11/13/2018 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER: (1) Granting #186 Joint Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint and (2) Approving Modified Excess Briefing. the Court GRANTS the request and MODIFIES the permitting briefing as follows: Defendants may file a motion to dismiss not to exceed 35 pages. Plaintiffs may file an opposition not to exceed 35 pages. Defendants may file a reply not to exceed 15 pages. The parties shall file a notice regarding the briefing schedule they seek no later than Friday, November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Rebecca Cassler, re #181 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/1/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Abascal, Manuel) (jdt).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #182 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #176 First Amended Complaint and granting #184 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #176 First Amended Complaint. Defendants Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, and Kirstjen Nielsen must answer to the First Amended Complaint by 11/20/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the First Amended Complaint Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). Modified on 11/3/2018 - Corrected filer and edited text (jah).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, Kirstjen Nielsen, Does 1-25 re #182 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, Does 1-25 . (Halaska, Alexander) (sjm).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 *** DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL #183 *** Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). Modified on 11/3/2018 - Corrected filer. Edited text (jah). (sjm).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11858535.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Cassler, Rebecca) (mdc)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying without prejudice Kathryn E. Shepherd's #175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Court denies the motion to withdraw without prejudice to the refiling of a new motion that satisfies the Local Rule and this Order. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Mary Bauer, re #172 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/5/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dsn)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sarah M. Rich, re #171 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/5/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dsn)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Errata re #176 Amended Complaint by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Bianca Doe, Carolina Doe, Cesar Doe, Dinora Doe, Emiliana Doe, Ingrid Doe, Juan Doe, Maria Doe, Roberto Doe, Victoria Doe, Ursula Doe, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abascal, Manuel). Modified on 10/16/2018 - No provision for acceptance. QC Email sent re proper procedure to correct or supplement existing entries (jah).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen, Does 1-25, filed by Abigail Doe, Al Otro Lado, Inc., Ingrid Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ursula Doe, Victoria Doe, Bianca Doe, Juan Doe, Roberto Doe, Cesar Doe, Maria Doe, Emiliana Doe. (Abascal, Manuel). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Added "First" to text (jah).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Withdraw Kathryn Shepherd as Attorney by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Walters, Karolina). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Wrong event. QC Email sent re L.R. 83.3.g.3. Corrected entry (jah).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe re #173 Notice of Change of Address (Crow, Melissa). (jah).
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa E. Crow (Crow, Melissa). Modified on 10/12/2018 - QC Email sent to update contact info in ECF per ECF I.f (jah).
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11756884.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Bauer, Mary)(jrd)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11756598.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Rich, Sarah)(jrd)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #148 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #167 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and for Answer to the First Amended Complaint. Court vacates the pleading deadlines set in Order #166 . Plaintiffs may file First Amended Complaint by 10/12/2018. If Plaintiffs file a First Amended Complaint, Defendants shall respond to the First Amended Complaint by 11/9/2018. If Plaintiffs do not file a First Amended Complaint by 10/12/2018, Defendants shall answer to the Complaint by 10/26/2018. If Plaintiffs do not file a First Amended Complaint, Defendants may move for reconsideration of Court's 8/20/2018 instead of filing an answer, by 10/26/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/4/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe re #167 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and for Defendants to Answer to the First Amended Complaint (Abascal, Manuel). (jah).
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and for Defendants to Answer to the First Amended Complaint by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel). Modified on 9/4/2018 - Edited text (jah).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #135 Motion to Dismiss. Court grants in part Defendants' motion to dismiss and dismisses without prejudice: a.) Plaintiffs A.D, B.D,, and C.D's claims under Section under 706(1) only insofar as they sought to compel agency action under 8 C.F.R. 235.4, and b.) all Plaintiffs' claims under section 706(2) regarding Defendants' alleged policy. Court denies on all other grounds Defendants' motion. Court grants Plaintiffs leave to amend the pleadings consistent with this Order. Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Complaint by 9/15/2018. If Plaintiffs do not file a First Amended Complaint or request additional time to do so, Defendants shall file an Answer by 9/24/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Aaron Reichlin-Melnick as Counsel of Record by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Reichlin-Melnick, Aaron)(acc).
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #163 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding (1) Supplemental Brief Regarding Defendants' Motion for Protective Order, (2) Supplemental Declaration of Johnny L. Armijo, and (3) Supplemental Declaration of Heather M. Robertson by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Halaska, Alexander) (rmc).
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: In light of the pending Joint Motion before this Court [Doc. No. 148] and the recently held Discovery Hearing, the telephonic Status Conference set for 3/16/18 [Doc. No. 144] is VACATED. (no document attached) (egs)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal (ECF No. #158 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, Kirstjen Nielsen re #154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, #158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen . (Saeed, Sairah)(mxn).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Saeed, Sairah)(mxn).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/28/2018, before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen L. Simone. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 3/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REDACTED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen re #148 Joint MOTION for Protective Order, 153 Discovery Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Johnny Armijo, #2 Declaration Adrian Guerra, #3 Declaration Heather Robertson, #4 Exhibit D - Article, #5 Exhibit E - Article, #6 Exhibit F - Article)(Saeed, Sairah). Modified on 3/9/2018 - Edited to reflect s redacted (jah).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/12/2018] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Saeed, Sairah) (aef). Modified corrected document link on 3/12/2018 (mxn). (Main Document 155 replaced on 3/12/2018) (mxn). Modified on 3/12/2018 to add file date of lodgment (mxn).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER #159 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL*** MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Saeed, Sairah) (aef). Modified to withdraw on 3/12/2018 (mxn).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Discovery Hearing (telephonic in Courtroom 1E) held on 2/28/2018. The Court ORDERS defendants to postpone the March 5, 2018 transition of the San Ysidro Port of Entry surveillance system to the Centralized Video Surveillance System ("CAVSS") until the Court rules on the Joint Motion. Government counsel is to provide any additional information requested by the court during todays hearing by Thursday, March 8 2018. Matter taken under submission. (CD# 2/28/2018 KSC 230-315). (Plaintiff Attorney F. Mohammadi, M. Laird, M. Abascal, M. Crow, A. Reichlin-Melnick). (Defendant Attorney S. Saeed, G. Kelly, B. Ward, L. Bick). (no document attached) (ecs) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Re Hearing on #148 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Court expects the parties to be fully prepared to argue all in the body of the Joint Motion, as well as any accompanying exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaela R. Laird on behalf of Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Laird, Michaela). Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Abigail Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Beatrice Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Carolina Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Dinora Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Ingrid Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Michaela R. Laird added to party Jose Doe(pty:pla). (jah).
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing: A telephonic Discovery Hearing has been set for 2/28/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford regarding the parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order. [Doc. No. 148]. After further review of the parties papers, The Court will issue a subsequent order delineating specific issues it wishes to address during the hearing. Counsel for plaintiffs shall call Judge Crawfords chambers at the appointed time with all counsel on the line. If the parties prefer, the Court can provide a conference call-in line. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no document attached) (lc2)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen re #148 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Saeed, Sairah). (jah).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X)(Saeed, Sairah). Modified on 2/21/2018 - No Proof of Service. Double wording in text. QC Email sent to file Proof of Service (jah).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Change of Address by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Crow, Melissa). Modified on 2/21/2018 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Edited text (jah).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Withdrawal of James H. Moon as Counsel of Record by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Moon, James)(mxn).
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re #135 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying without prejudice #127 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute; granting Defendants' #136 Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery is stayed until the District Court rules on #135 Motion to Dismiss and a renewed Scheduling Order is issued. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/16/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. The Scheduling Order #87 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re #135 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Abascal, Manuel). (jah).
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 REPLY to Response to Motion re #136 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen. (Halaska, Alexander). (jah).
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Ward on behalf of Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Todd C. Owen (Ward, Brian)Attorney Brian Ward added to party Elaine C. Duke (pty:dft), Attorney Brian Ward added to party Kevin K. McAleenan (pty:dft), Attorney Brian Ward added to party Kirstjen Nielsen (pty:dft), Attorney Brian Ward added to party Todd C. Owen (pty:dft). (jah).
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DECLARATION re #139 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moon, James) (anh).
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) (anh).
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting Individual Plaintiffs' #128 Unopposed Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously. Because Court must consider the particular prejudice to the opposing party at each stage of the proceedings, this grant is without prejudice to any future challenge by the Defendants at a later stage in the proceedings, and trial. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Plaintiffs may file an opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery [Doc. No. 136] on or before 1/5/18. Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiffs' opposition on or before 1/12/18.(no document attached) (lc2)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Gisela Westwater)(Westwater, Gisela). (jah).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION to Dismiss by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Kelly, Genevieve). Attorney Genevieve Kelly added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:res), Attorney Genevieve Kelly added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:res), Attorney Genevieve Kelly added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:res). Modified on 12/15/2017 - Removed duplicate attachment descriptions (jah).
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Abigail Doe, #3 Declaration of Beatrice Doe, #4 Declaration of Carolina Doe, #5 Declaration of Dinora Doe, #6 Declaration of Ingrid Doe, #7 Declaration of Jose Doe, #8 Proof of Service)(Abascal, Manuel). (jah).
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Angelo Guisado, re #125 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2017.(kcm)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ghita Schwarz, re #124 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2017.(kcm)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Baher Azmy, re #123 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2017.(kcm)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Aaron Reichlin-Melnick, re #122 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2017.(kcm)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Melissa E. Crow, re #121 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2017.(kcm)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Karolina J. Walters, re #120 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/8/2017.(kcm)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Manuel Abascal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Declaration of Gisela Westwater, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit AB, #31 Exhibit AC, #32 Exhibit AD, #33 Exhibit AE, #34 Exhibit AF, #35 Exhibit AG, #36 Exhibit AH, #37 Exhibit AI, #38 Proof of Service)(Abascal, Manuel). Modified on 12/11/2017 - Edited text (jah).
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe re #120 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #123 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #125 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #124 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #122 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #121 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Moon, James) (ajs).
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10701545.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Guisado, Angelo)(jrd)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10701544.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schwarz, Ghita)(jrd)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10701543.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Azmy, Baher)(jrd)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10701533.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Reichlin-Melnick, Aaron)(jrd)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10701532.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Crow, Melissa)(jrd)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10701529.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Walters, Karolina)(jrd)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER on #118 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The Court GRANTS Defendants' ex parte request. (ECF No. 118.) Defendants shall file the motion to dismiss the Complaint no later than 12/15/2017. For briefing purposes, the Court SETS a hearing date for the motion to dismiss of 2/12/2018. Plaintiffs may file an opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss no later than 1/29/2018. Defendants may file a reply no later than 2/5/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/5/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Refile) Motion to Dismiss by Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Gisela Westwater)(Westwater, Gisela)(acc).
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: A telephonic Status Conference has been set for 12/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the conference by calling Judge Crawford's chambers at the appointed time with all counsel on the line. (no document attached) (lc2)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17cv2366-BAS(KSC).(no document attached) (jao)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (dlg)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-05111. Original file received electronically
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed 10/25/17; Docket No. #71 ; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES UNOPPOSED MOTION TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY filed 10/16/17; Docket No. #61 ; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICEDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1)AND 12(b)(6) filed 10/12/17; Docket No. #58 ; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICEDEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY OR GRANT PROTECTIVE RELIEF, PENDING DECISION ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE [filed 10/25/17; Docket No. #72 ; and ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFSMOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed 11/13/17; Docket No. #98 .This action is herebyTRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DECLARATION of James H. Moon in Support of MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production #73 , #111 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Moon, James) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production #73 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBP OPR Directive, #2 Exhibit B - CBP HRM Directive, #3 Exhibit C - DHS OIG Directive, #4 Exhibit D - DHS CRCL Annual Report, #5 Exhibit E - Decl. of Bryan Molnar, #6 Exhibit F - Expedited Removal Memo, #7 Exhibit G - July 27, 2016 Muster, #8 Exhibit H - Sept. 1, 2016 Muster, #9 Exhibit I - CBP Language Access Plan, #10 Exhibit J - Decl. of Dhanraj Samaroo)(Halaska, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexander James Halaska on behalf of Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Alexander James Halaska added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander James Halaska added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander James Halaska added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Halaska, Alexander) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Defendants' re MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery #72 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davila, Yamileth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #71 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Decision)(Kelly, Genevieve) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery re MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery #72 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #71 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H, #2 Proposed Order)(Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 DECLARATION of Baher Azmy In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Azmy, Baher) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 DECLARATION of Melissa Crow in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Crow, Melissa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 DECLARATION of Manuel A. Abascal In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECLARATION of Karhryn Shepherd in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Shepherd, Kathryn) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DECLARATION of Faraz R. Mohammadi In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #98 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O, #2 Exhibits P-V)(Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Abigail Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Beatrice Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Carolina Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Dinora Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Ingrid Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Faraz Mohammadi added to party Jose Doe(pty:pla))(Mohammadi, Faraz) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph De Leon, #2 Declaration of Abigail Doe, #3 Declaration of Beatrice Doe, #4 Declaration of Carolina Doe, #5 Declaration of Dinora Doe, #6 Declaration of Ingrid Doe, #7 Declaration of Jose Doe, #8 Declaration of Diego Iniguez-Lopez, #9 Declaration of Brantley Shaw Drake, #10 Declaration of Leah Jahan Chavla, #11 Declaration of Jennifer Harbury, #12 Declaration of Joanna Williams, #13 Declaration of Clara Long, #14 Proposed Order) (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery #72 filed by Defendant DOES. (Davila, Yamileth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY In support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #71 filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Kelly, Genevieve) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STATEMENT (Joint) Regarding Meet and Confer on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss #58 and Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously #61 are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for November 13, 2017 is hereby vacated. The matters will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (cw) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECLARATION of James H. Moon in Opposition to MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery #72 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Moon, James) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Opposition re: MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery #72 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 DECLARATION of James H. Moon in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #71 filed by Plaintiffs Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Moon, James) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California #71 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Pinheiro)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Class Representatives' Unopposed Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously #61 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting Class Representatives' Unopposed Motion to Proceed Pseudonymously)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously #61 filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Court Trial set for 7/31/2018 at 8:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2018 at 10:00 AM. (SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES.) (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter.The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on November 13, 2017 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 4/2/2018. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: 4/5/2018. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re to Dismiss Case #58 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Statement of Proposed Decision)(Kelly, Genevieve) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re to Dismiss Case #58 (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant DOES. (Davila, Yamileth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt counsel for Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. Sherease Pratt is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counsel for Named Defendants Sherease Pratt. (Pratt, Sherease) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: Upon consideration of Defendants' ex parte application to continue the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel due to the unavailability of Gisela A. Westwater, Defendants lead counsel, on November 16, 2017, and of plaintiffs' opposition, and for good cause shown, this Court GRANTS Defendants' ex parte application (ECF No. 75). The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel, currently scheduled to be held on November 16, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., shall be continued until: Thursday, November 30, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. #76 (bem) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY In support to Dismiss Case #58 filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Kelly, Genevieve) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Named Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #76 served on 10/27/2017 & 10/29/2017. (Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECLARATION of James H. Moon in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #76 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney James H Moon added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla))(Moon, James) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #76 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Named Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gisela A. Westwater, Lead Trial Counsel for Defendants, #2 Exhibit A - Travel Itinerary, #3 Exhibit B - Email Communications, #4 Exhibit C - Email Communications, #5 Proposed Order)(Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge John F. Walter, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue the Scheduling Conference #74 . No appearances will be required for the Scheduling Conference and Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss - The Court will rule on the papers. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Confernce and Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss from November 13, 2017 to November 27, 2017 Re: to Dismiss Case #58 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #49 filed by Named Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gisela A. Westwater, Lead Trial Counsel for Defendants, #2 Exhibit A - Travel Itinerary, #3 Exhibit B - Email Communications, #4 Exhibit C - Email Communications, #5 Proposed Order) (Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Attachments: #1 Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of James H. Moon, #3 Declaration of Sairah G. Saeed, #4 Exhibits A-T, #5 Proposed Order)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery filed by Defendants DOES. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (email of 10/13/17), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Email of 10/17/17), #3 Proposed Order)(Davila, Yamileth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California filed by Named Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Information, #2 Proposed Order) (Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) #58 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Dismiss Case - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) Other error(s) with document(s): Filer used the event Memorandum in Support of Motion; which does not prompt the user to set a hearing before the judge. Clerk has converted the event so as to place the matter on calendar on 11/13/2017 at 1:30 PM., and modified your docket entry to reflect the caption of document. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Text Entry Only Order: Docket entries #62 and #65 . Hearing dates violate the Court's Standing Order.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: objection/Opposition (Motion related) - under Category - Responses, Replies and Other Motion Related Documents. Other error(s) with document(s): Miscellaneous Document event utilized in docketing this filing. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe re: Memorandum in Support of Motion #58 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Manuel A. Abascal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge John F. Walter regarding Scheduling Conference and Briefing Schedule for Defendants Motions #63 . NO SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 *stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Stay of Discovery filed by defendants DOES. Motion set for hearing on 12/11/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (email of 10/13/17), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (Email of 10/17/17))(Davila, Yamileth) Modified on 10/24/2017 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STATEMENT Parties' Meet and Confer Discussions filed by Defendant DOES (Davila, Yamileth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Scheduling Conference and Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 *stricken* NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of California filed by Named Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Information, #2 Proposed Order) (Westwater, Gisela) Modified on 10/24/2017 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. Motion set for hearing on 11/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abigail Doe, #2 Declaration of Beatrice Doe, #3 Declaration of Carolina Doe, #4 Declaration of Dinora Doe, #5 Declaration of Ingrid Doe, #6 Declaration of Jose Doe, #7 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge John F. Walter Regarding Confidential Information Identifying Named Plaintiffs #57 . (SEE ATTACHMENT OF THIS ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Memorandum in Support of Motion #58 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for MTD)(Kelly, Genevieve) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants DOES, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. Motion hearing set for 11/13/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Attorney Genevieve M Kelly added to party DOES(pty:dft))(Kelly, Genevieve) Modified on 10/24/2017 (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Confidential Information Identifying Named Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Genevieve M Kelly on behalf of Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Genevieve M Kelly added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Genevieve M Kelly added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Genevieve M Kelly added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Kelly, Genevieve) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATEMENT Regarding the Parties' Meet and Confer Discussions filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Yamileth G Davila on behalf of Defendants DOES, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Yamileth G Davila added to party DOES(pty:dft), Attorney Yamileth G Davila added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Yamileth G Davila added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Yamileth G Davila added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Davila, Yamileth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel, #51 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Sherease Pratt to Gisela A Westwater. filed by Named Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen, (Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Gisela A Westwater on behalf of Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. Filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Gisela A Westwater added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Gisela A Westwater added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Gisela A Westwater added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Westwater, Gisela) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Moon, James) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 11/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 10/31/2017. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER #44 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The Named Defendants shall have an additional 30 days to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action, up to and including October 12, 2017; and 2. Plaintiffs shall have an additional 30 days to file their Motion for Class Certification, resulting in a deadline of November 13, 2017. In order to facilitate settlement discussions and not prejudice Plaintiffs for agreeing to this stipulation, the Named Defendants shall not oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification based on any delay by Plaintiffs in filing for class certification or on the grounds that the claims of any one or more of the named Plaintiffs became moot between September 8, 2017 and the time that Plaintiffs file their Motion for Class Certification. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sairah Saeed on behalf of Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Sairah Saeed added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Sairah Saeed added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Sairah Saeed added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Saeed, Sairah) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DECLARATION of Sherease Pratt re Notice of Appearance, #43 filed by Defendants Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (Pratt, Sherease) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Danielle K Schuessler on behalf of Defendants DOES, Elaine C. Duke, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Danielle K Schuessler added to party DOES(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle K Schuessler added to party Elaine C. Duke(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle K Schuessler added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle K Schuessler added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Schuessler, Danielle) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kevin K. McAleenan answer now due 10/12/2017; Todd C. Owen answer now due 10/12/2017; Elaine C. Duke answer now due 10/12/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Kevin K. McAleenan; Todd C. Owen; Elaine C. Duke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sherease Pratt, #2 Proposed Order)(Pratt, Sherease) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt on behalf of Defendants John F. Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen (Attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt added to party John F. Kelly(pty:dft), Attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Sherease Rosalyn Pratt added to party Todd C. Owen(pty:dft))(Pratt, Sherease) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristin P Housh counsel for Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. Kristin P. Housh is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, and Jose Doe. (Attorney Kristin P Housh added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla))(Housh, Kristin) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ingrid Doe, Beatrice Doe, Jose Doe, Abigail Doe, Al Otro Lado, Inc., Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, upon Defendant John F. Kelly served on 7/14/2017, answer due 9/12/2017; Kevin K. McAleenan served on 7/14/2017, answer due 9/12/2017; Todd C. Owen served on 7/14/2017, answer due 9/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Pat M. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Helga Taylor for John F. Kelly. Recipient names illegible for Kevin K. McAleenan and Todd C. Owen. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Effective August 7, 2017, Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 690 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 690 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: granting #30 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa E Crow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, designating Wayne S Flick as local counsel. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: granting #31 Non-Resident Attorney Karolina J Walters APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, designating Wayne S Flick as local counsel. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Ghita Schwarz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, designating Wayne S Flick as local counsel. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: granting #32 Non-Resident Attorney Angelo Guisado APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, designating Wayne S Flick as local counsel. (jp) Modified on 8/1/2017 (jp). [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney Baher Azmy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, designating Wayne S Flick as local counsel. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ghita Schwarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/12/2017, Receipt No. 097320164851) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Baher Azmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/12/2017, Receipt No. 097320164594) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angelo Guisado to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/12/2017, Receipt No. 097320164717) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karolina J. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/12/2017, Receipt No. 097320165032) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa E. Crow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/12/2017, Receipt No. 097320165132) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Abigail Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Beatrice Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Carolina Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Dinora Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Ingrid Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Wayne S Flick added to party Jose Doe(pty:pla)) (Flick, Wayne) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John F. Walter: granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn E Shepherd APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, designating Manuel A Abascal as local counsel. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING DOES by Judge John F. Walter: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 25, inclusive. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, OCR program caused original signature to appear as a cut and paste attachment on PHV application. #26 (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn E. Shepherd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/ #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel Regarding Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn E. Shepherd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 7/12/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20164941) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by chambers of Judge John F. Walter. If not yet provided, courtesy copies of all case opening documents shall be delivered to chambers by 10:30 a.m. on July 19, 2017. (Refer to Court's Standing Order and Local Rule 5-4.5) Failure to comply may result in an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal and/or Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rules. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jloz) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John A. Kronstadt, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-03972 JAK(PLAx) (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn E. Shepherd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2 #12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karolina J. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2 #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa E. Crow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20165 #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants John F. Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Todd C. Owen. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn E. Shepherd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2 #12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Baher Azmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20164594) #9 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angelo Guisado to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-201647 #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons Re: Summons Request #3 , #4 , #5 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa E. Crow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20 165132) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karolina J. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 097 3-20165032) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathryn E. Shepherd to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 097 3-20164941) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ghita Schwarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2016 4851) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angelo Guisado to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-201 64717) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Baher Azmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2016459 4) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. Related Case(s): 2:13-cv-03972-JAK-PLA (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe, (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Al Otro Lado, Inc., Abigail Doe, Beatrice Doe, Carolina Doe, Dinora Doe, Ingrid Doe, Jose Doe. (Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20163884 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Ingrid Doe, Carolina Doe, Al Otro Lado, Inc., Beatrice Doe, Jose Doe, Abigail Doe, Dinora Doe. (Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Abigail Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Beatrice Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Carolina Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Dinora Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Ingrid Doe(pty:pla), Attorney Manuel A Abascal added to party Jose Doe(pty:pla))(Abascal, Manuel) [Transferred from California Central on 11/22/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Otro Lado, Inc. et al v. McAleenan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Doe
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Doe
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Doe
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Doe
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinora Doe
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Doe
Represented By: Robin A Kelley
Represented By: James H Moon
Represented By: Kristin P Housh
Represented By: Melissa E Crow
Represented By: Baher Azmy
Represented By: Angelo Guisado
Represented By: Wayne S Flick
Represented By: Karolina J Walters
Represented By: Faraz Mohammadi
Represented By: Kathryn E Shepherd
Represented By: Manuel A Abascal
Represented By: Ghita Schwarz
Represented By: Kristin Housh
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Sarah Marion Rich
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Mary Catherine Bauer
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Robin Kelley
Represented By: Aaron E. Reichlin-Melnick
Represented By: James H. Moon
Represented By: Angelo R. Guisado
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Melissa E. Crow
Represented By: Michaela R. Laird
Represented By: Faraz R. Mohammadi
Represented By: Ghita R. Schwarz
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Karolina J. Walters
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emiliana Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Cassler
Represented By: Matthew Ellis Fenn
Represented By: Allison Parr
Represented By: Victoria Murphy
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal
Represented By: Micah D. Stein
Represented By: Ori Lev
Represented By: Matthew H. Marmolejo
Represented By: Stephen Medlock
Represented By: Sydney R. Fields
Represented By: Michelle N. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd C. Owen
Represented By: Genevieve M Kelly
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Sherease Rosalyn Pratt
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Represented By: Katherine J Shinners
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sairah G. Saeed
Represented By: Gisela Ann Westwater
Represented By: Danielle K. Schuessler
Represented By: Brian Ward
Represented By: Alexander James Halaska
Represented By: Dhruman Y. Sampat
Represented By: Hayden Windrow
Represented By: Genevieve Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine C. Duke
Represented By: Genevieve M Kelly
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Sherease Rosalyn Pratt
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Represented By: Katherine J Shinners
Represented By: Sairah G. Saeed
Represented By: Gisela Ann Westwater
Represented By: Danielle K. Schuessler
Represented By: Brian Ward
Represented By: Alexander James Halaska
Represented By: Dhruman Y. Sampat
Represented By: Hayden Windrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Genevieve M Kelly
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Sherease Rosalyn Pratt
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Represented By: Katherine J Shinners
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Ari Nazarov
Represented By: Sairah G. Saeed
Represented By: Gisela Ann Westwater
Represented By: Danielle K. Schuessler
Represented By: Brian Ward
Represented By: Alexander James Halaska
Represented By: Dhruman Y. Sampat
Represented By: Hayden Windrow
Represented By: Genevieve Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Genevieve M Kelly
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Represented By: Katherine J Shinners
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Sairah G. Saeed
Represented By: Gisela Ann Westwater
Represented By: Danielle K. Schuessler
Represented By: Brian Ward
Represented By: Alexander James Halaska
Represented By: Dhruman Y. Sampat
Represented By: Hayden Windrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Represented By: Katherine J Shinners
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Ari Nazarov
Represented By: Gisela Ann Westwater
Represented By: Danielle K. Schuessler
Represented By: Brian Ward
Represented By: Alexander James Halaska
Represented By: Dhruman Y. Sampat
Represented By: Hayden Windrow
Represented By: Genevieve Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Represented By: Hayden Windrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Represented By: Genevieve M Kelly
Represented By: Danielle K Schuessler
Represented By: Yamileth G. Davila
Represented By: Ari Nazarov
Represented By: Danielle K. Schuessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: the Young Center for Immigrant Children's Rights at the University of Chicago Law School
Represented By: Meryl Holt
Represented By: Matthew D. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kids in Need of Defense
Represented By: Meryl Holt
Represented By: Matthew D. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Members of Congress
Represented By: Alexandra Hiatt
Represented By: Jamie Stephen Dycus
Represented By: Matthew Donald Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amnesty International
Represented By: Susan Kay Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: James Fred Zahradka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Services for Children
Represented By: Meryl Holt
Represented By: Matthew D. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amici Curiae
Represented By: Michael D Kibler
Represented By: Susan Baker Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: the Unaccompanied Minors Program of Catholic Charities Community Services, Archdiocese of New York
Represented By: Meryl Holt
Represented By: Matthew D. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Counsel
Represented By: Meryl Holt
Represented By: Matthew D. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?