Cardenas v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Machelle Cardenas
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc., American Airlines Group, Inc., Tony LNU and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2017cv02513
Filed: December 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/8/19. (dlg)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 37 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The hearing set for April 5, 2019 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/3/19. (dlg)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting Defendant Anthony Redelfs' Erroneously Sued as Tony LNU 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Denying Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process as Moot. The hearing set for December 20, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/11/18. (dlg)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The hearing set for June 28, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/18/18. (dlg)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within seven days of the filed date of this order. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint, Defendants shall file an answer within twenty-one days of the filed date of this order. The hearing set for May 4, 2018 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/26/18. (dlg)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying 8 Plaintiff's Request for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Prior to Filing of an Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/31/18. (dlg)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Dissolving Order to Show Cause for Improper Venue. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/5/18.(dlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle Cardenas
Represented By: William L Miltner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?