Matthews v. San Diego County Board of Supervisors et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Matthews
Defendant: San Diego County Board of Supervisors, Teresa Willis, Michael Murphy and San Diego County Treasure's Office
Case Number: 3:2018cv00711
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion (ECF No. 21 ). The Court denies all aspects of Plaintiff's motion except that which seeks a 30-day extension of time to file. Such motion is granted: Plaintiff must file a response brief, if any, no later than 11/19/2018. Any reply must be filed no later than 11/28/2018. The new hearing date is 12/14/2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/19/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
May 9, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File Supplemental Briefing Re: Bankruptcy Stay by May 21, 2018. Defendant may file a responsive brief and brief any alternative bases for a stay by June 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/9/18.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 17, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Request for a Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/17/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. San Diego County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County Treasure's Office
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?