Hoyt v. Kernan

Plaintiff: Johnae Hoyt
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Case Number: 3:2018cv00716
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/17/2018. (mpl)
May 16, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/16/2018. (jdt)
April 17, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prepay the $400 filing fee required by 28 USC 1914(a). Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the da te of this Order to re-open the case by either: 1) paying the entire $400 statutory and administrative filing fee, or 2) filing new Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim pu rsuant to 28 USC 1915A. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days leave from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's 4 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/17/2018. (Blank Motion for IFP form t/w copy of this Order mailed to Plaintiff's Counsel) (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt v. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnae Hoyt
Represented By: Benjamin Meir Rudin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?