Payment Logistics Limited v. Lighthouse Network, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Payment Logistics Limited
Defendant: Lighthouse Network, LLC, Shift4 Corporation and Shift4 Payments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00786
Filed: April 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Presiding Judge: Andrew G. Schopler
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:0014
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 104 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and denying 114 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 11/30/2020. (jpp)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting Applications to File Under Seal [Docs. 99 , 105 , 108 , 111 .. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/3/2020. (anh)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend the complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/30/2019. (sjt)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting 60 71 76 79 83 Applications to File Under Seal. Each application to seal is granted. The Clerk is directed to file under seal the following: (1) the redacted portions of FAC, (2) portions of Shift4's memorandum of p oints and authorities in support of Shift4's motion to dismiss PLL's FAC, (3) the redacted portions of PLL's opposition to Shift4's motion to dismiss, (4) the redacted portions of PLL's counter motion to Shift4's request for judicial notice and exhibits, and (5) the redacted portions of Shift4's reply memorandum of points and authorities in support of Shift4's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/14/2019. (rmc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 25 ]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/18/2019. (lrf)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 19 ]. For the reasons stated in this order, the Court grants Defendants' motion. The Court grants PLL's request for leave to amend its initial complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/23/2018. (lrf)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/7/2018. (lrf)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery (ECF No. 26 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Clinton Averitte on 8/14/2018. (lrf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payment Logistics Limited v. Lighthouse Network, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payment Logistics Limited
Represented By: Daniel J Mogin
Represented By: Jonathan L. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lighthouse Network, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Breslauer
Represented By: Charles B. Casper
Represented By: Thomas W McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shift4 Corporation
Represented By: Peter S. Breslauer
Represented By: Charles B. Casper
Represented By: Thomas W McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shift4 Payments, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Breslauer
Represented By: Charles B. Casper
Represented By: Thomas W McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?