Gold v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Michelle Gold
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2018cv01323
Filed: June 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Presiding Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. Having reviewed Plaintiffs motion, the Court hereby awards to Monica Perales attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) in the amount of $22,948.00. The Court further orders Monica Perales to reimburse Michelle Gold the amount of $4,000.00 for EAJA fees awarded. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/1/2021. (mme)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, (2) Granting 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (3) Denying 17 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. This Court, having reviewed de novo the Magistrate Judge's R&R, adopts the Magistrate Judge's recommendation in full. The Clerk of the Court shall enter the judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/19/2019.(aef)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment [ECF Nos. 16 and 17 ]. Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/23/2019.(jrm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?