Bowersock v. Kernan et al
Plaintiff: Mark M. Bowersock
Defendant: M. Rodrigues, A Williams, Scott Kernan, Stuart Sherman and C. Ramos
Case Number: 3:2018cv01484
Filed: June 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983cv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes assigned to transfer case from California Northern District. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-03057. Original file received electronically
June 28, 2018 Remark: Civil Case File Electronically Transferred to the Southern District of California. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 6/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 8 Letter from Plaintiff regarding recent filings. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark M. Bowersock.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mark M. Bowersock. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Scott Kernan, C. Ramos, M. Rodrigues, Stuart Sherman, A. Williams. Filed byMark M. Bowersock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/2/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 7/2/2018. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 1 REQUEST For Correspondence Approval With Legal Assistant James Vansickle For Medical-Legal Purposes by Mark M. Bowersock. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) Modified on 5/23/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/24/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/28/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowersock v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark M. Bowersock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?