Castillo et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nanet Castillo and Glenn Castillo
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., First American Title Insurance Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Does 1 through 25 and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01591
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) : Responses due by 8/7/2018; Replies due by 8/14/2018; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion hearing scheduled for 10/25/18 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Removal of Counsel of Record by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Joinder by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sosnicki, Lukas) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Proof of Service)(Ramos, James)Attorney James J. Ramos added to party Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney James J. Ramos added to party U.S. Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (acc).
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) by First American Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by First American Title Insurance Company to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6), #2 Notice Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Dreyfuss, Lawrence) (acc).
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Other Affiliate U.S. BANK, N.A. Successor to Bank of America N.A. as Successor in Interest to LASALLE BANK, N.A. as Trustee on behalf of WAMU Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR for U.S. Bank, N.A.; Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (tcf)(jrd)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00026988-CU-OR-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11441264.), filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court pleadings)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1591-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(tcf)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence J Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Marvin Belo Adviento
Represented By: James J. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marvin Belo Adviento
Represented By: James J. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanet Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?