Stevens v. Apptech Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Stevens
Defendant: Does 1-10, Luke D'Angelo, Apptech Corp. and Transfer Online, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01643
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants AppTech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, and Transfer Online, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint by 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 09/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc.. (Micheil, Shane) (ajs).
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Transfer Online, Inc., Luke D'Angelo, Apptech Corp. re #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Transfer Online, Inc., Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo . (Micheil, Shane) (ajs).
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN per (ECF No. #15 )***Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheil, Shane) QC mailer sent re: proposed order should not be attached, and missing plaintiff's signature. Atty to withdraw and refile (ajs). Modified on 9/12/2018 to withdraw document (ajs).
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies. Mail sent to Robert Stevens. (ajs)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Victoria Bruno, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline for Defendants AppTech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, and Transfer Online, Inc., to respond to the Complaint is 09/14/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 08/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Stevens. Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc. served. Nunc Pro Tunc 08/14/2018, per Order (ECF No. #9 ). (ajs)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge William Q. Hayes Accepting Document: Proof of Service Summons and Complaint, from Plaintiff Robert Stevens. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Incorrect case number listed on document. Nunc Pro Tunc 08/14/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 08/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Thomas Micheil on behalf of Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc. (Micheil, Shane) (ajs).
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc. re #3 Notice of Appearance, (Micheil, Shane) (ajs).
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11564772 Re: Doc. No. #5 )(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bruno, Victoria)(jrd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11564772.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Bruno, Victoria)(QC Mailer sent; missing signature.)(jrd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Micheil, Shane) QC reminder email sent re: proposed order should not be attached (ajs).
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN per (ECF No. #7 )*** NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Thomas Micheil on behalf of Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Transfer Online, Inc. (Micheil, Shane)Attorney Shane Thomas Micheil added to party Apptech Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Shane Thomas Micheil added to party Luke D'Angelo(pty:dft), Attorney Shane Thomas Micheil added to party Transfer Online, Inc.(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: PDF in fillable format. Atty to withdraw and refile (ajs). Modified on 8/17/2018 to withdraw document (ajs).
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (lrc)(jao).
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apptech Corp., Luke D'Angelo, Does 1-10, Transfer Online, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS102540.), filed by Robert Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Receipt)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1643-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(lrc) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Apptech Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke D'Angelo
Represented By: Shane Thomas Micheil
Represented By: Victoria Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apptech Corp.
Represented By: Shane Thomas Micheil
Represented By: Victoria Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transfer Online, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Thomas Micheil
Represented By: Victoria Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?