Alexandra Investments, Inc. v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Investments, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100 and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01738
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Karen S Crawford
3 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Remand. FCA is ordered to show cause why this case and each of the related cases should not be immediately remanded. FCA is further ordered to show cause why Case No. 18cv1203-LAB-BLM should not be remanded or dismissed for improper venue. FCA should submit a single brief by 10/10/2018, not to exceed ten pages, discussing jurisdiction and/or venue as to all of the related cases. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Lee Nilsen on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nilsen, Ryan)Attorney Ryan Lee Nilsen added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt).
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Following Case Management Conference. A Case Management Conference was held on 8/20/2018. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 12/18/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. The Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 8/12/2019. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/19/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/20/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major:(T) Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2018. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Calvin Davis).(Defendant Attorney Ryan Nielsen). (no document attached) (asm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin Williams Davis on behalf of Alexandra Investments, Inc. (Davis, Calvin)Attorney Calvin Williams Davis added to party Alexandra Investments, Inc.(pty:pla) (jdt).
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Alexandra Investments, Inc. re #7 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Rose, Adam). QC Mail - Missing proof of service. Modified on 8/13/2018 (jdt).
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Morris Rose on behalf of Alexandra Investments, Inc. (Rose, Adam)Attorney Adam Morris Rose added to party Alexandra Investments, Inc.(pty:pla). QC Mail - improper format; courtesy reminder sent. Missing proof of service; instructed to file proof of service separately. Modified on 8/13/2018 (jdt). (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/13/2018) (jdt).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Finding Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Inappropriate and Setting Case Management Conference. Based upon the pleadings in this case and the similarities to the related case, the Court finds it inappropriate to convene an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The ENE that was set for 9/27/2018 is vacated. See ECF Nos. #5 and #6 . A Joint Discovery Plan is due 8/10/2018. The Court will hold a telephonic, attorneys-only initial Case Management Conference on 8/20/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/3/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) Modified on 8/3/2018 to correct docket text (jdt).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:18-cv-01203-LAB-BLM. The new case number is 18cv1738-LAB-BLM. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 8/1/2018. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/30/2018.(acc)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/27/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/1/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by FCA US, LLC of case(s) 3:18-cv-01203-LAB-BLM [CA Notified]. (jrm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US, LLC. (jrm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US, LLC. (jrm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02018-00031440-CU-BC-CTL ( filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11498735), filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 state court complaint)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01738-CAB-KSC. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexandra Investments, Inc. v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Starr
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Calvin Williams Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Jonna D Lothyan
Represented By: Ryan Lee Nilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?