Cabelka v. County of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Cabelka
Defendant: Laurel Bredthauer, Sarah Wilson, County of San Diego, Fatimah Abdullah, Carlos Omeda, Marilyn Sproat, Does 1 Through 10 and Casey Family Programs
Case Number: 3:2018cv01756
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Cabelka. Marilyn Sproat served. (Stewart, Jomo) (ajs).
September 5, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Cabelka. County of San Diego served. (Stewart, Jomo) (ajs).
September 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Cabelka. Carlos Omeda served. (Stewart, Jomo) (ajs).
September 5, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Cabelka. Fatimah Abdullah served. (Stewart, Jomo) (ajs).
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Cabelka. Casey Family Programs served. (Stewart, Jomo) (ajs).
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie Cabelka. Laurel Bredthauer served. (Stewart, Jomo) (ajs).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Response to the Complaint. The Court Grants the joint motion and will set a briefing schedule for Defendants to respond 21 days after it is has determined whether to consolidate this case with D.C. v. County of San Diego, et al. (Case No. 3:18-cv-00013-WQH-KSC). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 08/28/2018. (ajs)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm D Schick on behalf of Laurel Bredthauer, Casey Family Programs (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schick, Malcolm)Attorney Malcolm D Schick added to party Laurel Bredthauer(pty:dft), Attorney Malcolm D Schick added to party Casey Family Programs(pty:dft) (ajs).
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Laurel Bredthauer, Casey Family Programs of case(s) 18-cv-0013 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Sean) (ajs).
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Edward Smith on behalf of Laurel Bredthauer, Casey Family Programs (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Smith, Sean)Attorney Sean Edward Smith added to party Laurel Bredthauer(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Edward Smith added to party Casey Family Programs(pty:dft) (ajs).
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint by Fatimah Abdullah, County of San Diego, Carlos Omeda, Marilyn Sproat. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kate D. Jones, #2 Proof of Service)(Jones, Kate) QC mailer sent re: atty Malcom D. Schick not atty of record on docket. Atty Schick to file Notice of Appearance (ajs).
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-00013-WQH-KSC. The new case number is 18cv1756-WQH-KSC. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/21/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/21/2018.(acc)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Fatimah Abdullah, County of San Diego, Carlos Omeda, Marilyn Sproat of case(s) 18cv0013-WQH-KSC . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jones, Kate) (acc).
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Dwyre Jones on behalf of Fatimah Abdullah, County of San Diego, Carlos Omeda, Marilyn Sproat (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Jones, Kate)Attorney Kate Dwyre Jones added to party Fatimah Abdullah(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Dwyre Jones added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Dwyre Jones added to party Carlos Omeda(pty:dft), Attorney Kate Dwyre Jones added to party Marilyn Sproat(pty:dft) (acc).
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fatimah County of San Diego, Casey Family Programs, Abdullah, Laurel Bredthauer, Carlos Omeda, Marilyn Sproat, Sarah Wilson, Does 1 Through 10, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11505706.), filed by Melanie Cabelka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01756-AJB-BGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Stewart, Jomo)(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabelka v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Bredthauer
Represented By: Malcolm D Schick
Represented By: Sean Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Kate Dwyre Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatimah Abdullah
Represented By: Kate Dwyre Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Omeda
Represented By: Kate Dwyre Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Sproat
Represented By: Kate Dwyre Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Family Programs
Represented By: Malcolm D Schick
Represented By: Sean Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Cabelka
Represented By: Jomo Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?