Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc. v. KnuEdge Inc.

Plaintiff: Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: KnuEdge Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01821
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
0 Judge: Roger T Benitez
1 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332ds
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant is ordered to respond to the complaint on or before October 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/1/2018. (jao)
September 21, 2018 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KnuEdge Inc. (Keller, Tobias) (jao).
September 19, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. KnuEdge Inc. answer due on or before 9/21/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/19/2018. (jao)
September 13, 2018 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by KnuEdge Inc.. (Keller, Tobias)Attorney Tobias S. Keller added to party KnuEdge Inc.(pty:dft) (jao).
August 10, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc.. KnuEdge Inc. served. (Charlson, Michael) (jao).
August 8, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Francis Ming Yang on behalf of Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc. (Yang, Francis)Attorney Francis Ming Yang added to party Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc.(pty:pla) (jao).
August 7, 2018 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1821-W-BGS.(no document attached) (anh)
August 3, 2018 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (dsn)
August 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against KnuEdge Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11523700.), filed by Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Table of Contents, #3 Exhibits)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1821-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Charlson, Michael)(jrm) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc. v. KnuEdge Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radiant Mission Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L Charlson
Represented By: Francis Ming Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KnuEdge Inc.
Represented By: Tobias S. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?