United States of America v. Horton

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Eric L. Horton
Case Number: 3:2018cv01855
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
0 Judge: Jan M Adler
1 Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Mejia, Christian). (jah).
September 6, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/26/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/2018.(sjm)
August 8, 2018 1 MOTION TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS against Eric L. Horton, Fee Waved, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1855-BTM-JMA. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case.(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Christian Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric L. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?