Crangle v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Caroline Q. Crangle
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N. A., MTC Financial, Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Does 1-100 and MTC Financial doing business as Trustee Corps
Case Number: 3:2018cv01883
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 bc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Telephonic attorneys-only Status Conference set for 11/13/2018 08:15 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/6/2018.(acc)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Court of Removal to Federal Court by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N. A. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Goldstein, Aaron)(acc).
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Bank Trust, N. A. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Goldstein, Aaron) (acc).
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Goldstein, Aaron) (acc).
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N. A. Identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N. A. (tcf) (jao).
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00028351-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11553699.), filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N. A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1883-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crangle v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N. A.
Represented By: Aaron R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial doing business as Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Q. Crangle
Represented By: Francisco J Aldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?