Glatts et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Donald Glatts, Thomas Glatts, Ronald Glatts and Robert Glatts
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 3:2018cv01904
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 rp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Second Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. The hearing on Wells Fargo's motion to dismiss is continued from 10/15/2018 to 11/05/2018. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/04/2018. (ajs)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Yun, Lisa) (ajs).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss. [Doc. No. #6 ]. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/17/2018. (anh)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing of Motion to Dismiss by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Yun, Lisa) (ajs).
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental Proof of Service. (Yun, Lisa) QC reminder email re: wrong event selected (ajs).
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Yun, Lisa) (ajs).
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (tcf) (jao).
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 ***Docketed in error*** ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (tcf) Modified on 8/16/2018 (tcf).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00032115-CU-MC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11563179.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1904-WQH-AGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glatts et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lisa S. Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Glatts
Represented By: John J. McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Glatts
Represented By: John J. McNutt
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Tresp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Glatts
Represented By: John J. McNutt
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Tresp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Glatts
Represented By: John J. McNutt
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Tresp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?