Box et al v. Broadway Center, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Carl Box and Jean Vilsaint
Defendant: Does 1-40, Broadway Center, LLC, Cam Commercial Properties, Inc., Broadway Center Associates, LLC, John L. Knight, Thomas Abbate and Excell Security, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01978
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: California Southern District Court
0 Judge: Roger T Benitez
1 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to further extend time for Defendant XL Staffing, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/04/2018. (jpp)
October 3, 2018 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Excell Security, Inc.. (Kroeger, Shelby) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carl Box. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Remand, #2 Declaration of Todd T. Cardiff ISO Remand, #3 Proof of Service)(Cardiff, Todd) (jpp).
September 12, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie Bodnar Swiss on behalf of Excell Security, Inc. (Swiss, Christie)Attorney Christie Bodnar Swiss added to party Excell Security, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
September 11, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion to extend time for Defendant XL Staffing, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. XL Staffing, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before 10/10/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/11/2018. (jpp)
September 10, 2018 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Excell Security, Inc.. (Kroeger, Shelby)Attorney Shelby Kathryn Kroeger added to party Excell Security, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
September 4, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas J. Whelan no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:16-cv-02575-JLS-BGS. The new case number is 18cv1978-JLS-BGS. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/29/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/30/2018. (jao)
August 31, 2018 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thomas Abbate, by Cam Commercial Properties, Inc., and by Broadway Center Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Lahiri, Ranjan)Attorney Ranjan Alok Lahiri added to party Broadway Center Associates, LLC(pty:dft) (jao).
August 28, 2018 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv1978-W-BGS.(no document attached) (anh)
August 24, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02018-00035505-CU-CR-CTL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11600884), filed by Cam Commercial Properties, Inc., Thomas Abbate, Broadway Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 state court complaint)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01978-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(jrm) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Box et al v. Broadway Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Center, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Tucker Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cam Commercial Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Tucker Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Center Associates, LLC
Represented By: Ranjan Alok Lahiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Abbate
Represented By: Daniel Tucker Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excell Security, Inc.
Represented By: Christie Bodnar Swiss
Represented By: Shelby Kathryn Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Box
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Vilsaint
Represented By: Todd T Cardiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?