People of the State of California v. International Boundary and Water Commission et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Defendant: International Boundary and Water Commission, Jose Nunez and International Boundary and Water Commission, United States Section
Intervenor Plaintiff: State Lands Commission
Case Number: 3:2018cv02050
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jan M Adler
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1251
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by State Lands Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proof of Service)(Peterson, Hayley)Attorney Hayley Elizabeth Peterson added to party State Lands Commission(pty:intvp) (sjm).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Jan M. Adler, to the calendar of the Honorable Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. All conferences or hearing dates previously set before Judge Adler will remain as scheduled and will be before Judge Lopez. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18cv2050 JM (LL). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/29/2018.(jcj)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by People of the State of California. All Defendants served. (Hoos, Phillip) (sjm).
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by People of the State of California of case(s) 18-cv-457-JM (JMA), 18-cv-1621-JM (JMA) . (Hoos, Phillip) Mod (sjm).
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Boundary and Water Commission, Jose Nunez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11631203.), filed by People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2050-JM-JMA. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Hoos, Phillip)(lrc) (sjt).
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Boundary and Water Commission, Jose Nunez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11631203.), filed by People of the State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2050-JM-JMA. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Hoos, Phillip)(lrc) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California v. International Boundary and Water Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Boundary and Water Commission
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Nunez
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Boundary and Water Commission, United States Section
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Phillip M. Hoos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State Lands Commission
Represented By: Hayley Elizabeth Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?