Blaker et al v. Credit One Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Blaker and Richard Blaker
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Credit One Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02108
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jan M Adler
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Motion to Remand and Remanding Case to San Diego Superior Court [Doc. No. #2 ] (Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.). Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/26/2018. (anh) (sjt).
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Richard Blaker, Samantha Blaker. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Golden, Jeremy) (anh).
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Richard, Damian) (anh).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Vacate TCPA Portions of Arbitration Award [Doc. No. #6 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/1/2018. (anh) (Main Document 7 replaced to on 10/1/2018) (anh).
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Vacate TCPA Portions of Arbitration Award by Richard Blaker, Samantha Blaker. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of service of Joint Motion To Continue)(Golden, Jeremy) (anh).
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing Date by Credit One Bank, N.A. re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Richard, Damian) (anh).
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Credit One Bank, N.A. re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award (Richard, Damian) (anh).
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration)(Richard, Damian) (anh).
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Richard Blaker, Samantha Blaker. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeremy S. Golden, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jeremy S. Golden, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jeremy S. Golden, #5 Proof of Service)(Golden, Jeremy) (anh).
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, San Diego, case number 37-2016-00009977-CU-NP-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11656331.), filed by Credit One Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2108-CAB-JMA. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case.(tcf) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaker et al v. Credit One Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Damian P. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Blaker
Represented By: Jeremy Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Blaker
Represented By: Jeremy Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?