LeChonne Wright v. UnitedHealth Group, et al
Plaintiff: LECHONNE WRIGHT
Respondent: UnitedHealth Group, Optum360 Services, Inc., JEFFERSON PATE JACKSON, does 1 through 100, LORRI ATKINS SIDES, MELISSA RUBEL, Optumrx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optuminsight, Inc. and Does 1 though 100
Case Number: 3:2018cv02116
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Joint Motion Stay Pending Arbitration. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Binding Arbitration and, MOTION to Stay by Optum360 Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Suder, Morgan) (aef).
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jefferson Pate Jackson, Optum360 Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., Melissa Rubel, Lorri Atkins Sides, UnitedHealth Group, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, does, filed by Lechonne Wright. (Tashroudian, David). Modified on 9/18/2018 - Party names entered in all caps by Central District of CA. Edited text (jah).
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-06931. Original file received electronically
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: GGOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN and all parties having stipulated thereto, it is hereby ordered as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), and the parties' stipulation, the Court hereby transfers this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Electronic docket sheet sent. Electronic documents are accessible through PACER. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Change Venue to USDC, Southern District of California filed by Defendants Optum360 Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer now due 9/19/2018; Optum360 Services, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018; Optumrx, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2018, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Optuminsight, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Optum360 Services, Inc.; Optumrx, Inc..(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2018; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer now due 9/4/2018; UnitedHealth Group answer now due 9/4/2018; Optum360 Services, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2018; Optumrx, Inc. answer now due 9/4/2018, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Optuminsight, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; UnitedHealth Group; Optum360 Services, Inc.; Optumrx, Inc..(Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party UnitedHealth Group(pty:dft))(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff LeChonne Wright, upon Defendant UnitedHealth Group served on 7/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 15) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff LeChonne Wright, upon Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated served on 7/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 11) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff LeChonne Wright, upon Defendant Optumrx, Inc. served on 6/25/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 7) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 100, Jefferson Pate Jackson, Optum360 Services, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., Optumrx, Inc., Melissa Rubel, Lorri Atkins Sides, UnitedHealth Group, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff LeChonne Wright. (Filed in state court 6/19/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc, identifying UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum360 Services, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Jill M. Toth re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sharon A. Stuckmayer re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Morgan P. Suder re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Certificate of Service)(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC710769 Receipt No: 0973-22246208 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Summons and Proofs of Service), #3 Exhibit C (All Other State Court Documents), #4 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party UnitedHealth Group Inc(pty:dft))(Suder, Morgan) [Transferred from California Central on 9/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeChonne Wright v. UnitedHealth Group, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UnitedHealth Group
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Morgan P. Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Optum360 Services, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa L. Lyftogt
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Morgan P. Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFFERSON PATE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LORRI ATKINS SIDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MELISSA RUBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Optumrx, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa L. Lyftogt
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Morgan P. Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Marissa L. Lyftogt
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Morgan P. Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa L. Lyftogt
Represented By: Morgan Paige Suder
Represented By: Morgan P. Suder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does 1 though 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LECHONNE WRIGHT
Represented By: Nancy L Abrolat
Represented By: Mona Tashroudian
Represented By: Melvin L Felton
Represented By: David Ali Tashroudian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?