Instant Checkmate, LLC v. DOES 1-10

Plaintiff: Instant Checkmate, LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv02132
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Instant Checkmate, LLC re #7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Busch, Matthew). (jah).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Terminating Motion. Court terminates #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC, because it lacks a memorandum of points and authorities and is superseded by ECF #7 . Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/15/2018. (jah)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Duplicate entry of #5 . Wrong event. No Proof of Service. QC Email sent to file Proof of Service (jah).
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Damon W.D. Wright re #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Has s/ of attorney not associated in case. Text has double wording. QC Email sent re ECF signature and duplicate text. Removed duplicate text (jah)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Busch, Matthew). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *TM No. 4,442,412* cc:USPTO (cdw) (jao).
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Instant Checkmate, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Pubrec LLC for Instant Checkmate, LLC. (cdw) (jao).
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11672190), filed by Instant Checkmate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibits A & B, #4 Copyright Report) (Copyright Report mailed). The new case number is 3:18-cv-02132-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Busch, Matthew)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Instant Checkmate, LLC v. DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Instant Checkmate, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?