Young v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: Jonathon Young
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC and Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC doing business as Dylan Point Loma Apartments
Case Number: 3:2018cv02149
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:8902
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Cole, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Class Allegations from Plaintiff's Complaint by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Cole, William)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Cole, William)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2149-BEN-MSB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/7/2018.(anh)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC answer due 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/11/2018. (anh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Paul Cole on behalf of Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC (Cole, William)Attorney William Paul Cole added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (anh).
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond by Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Orr, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Orr added to party Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC(pty:dft) QC Email Sent re: Proposed Order (anh).
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathon Young. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC served. (Wagner, Elizabeth) (anh).
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Jonathon Young (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Jonathon Young(pty:pla) (anh).
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Wagner on behalf of Jonathon Young (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wagner, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth Ann Wagner added to party Jonathon Young(pty:pla) (anh).
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (sjt).
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11678333.), filed by Jonathan Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2149-BEN-AGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Loker, Matthew)(lrc)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC
Represented By: William Paul Cole
Represented By: Matthew Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners, LLC doing business as Dylan Point Loma Apartments
Represented By: William Paul Cole
Represented By: Matthew Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathon Young
Represented By: Matthew M. Loker
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?