La Touraine, Inc. v. Varko et al
Plaintiff: La Touraine, Inc.
Defendant: V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD and Ivan Varko
Case Number: 3:2018cv02160
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11903673.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fray-Witzer, Evan)(dsn)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference With Counsel Only Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation with Counsel Only set for 1/8/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/14/2018.(anh)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Shayefar, Matthew) (anh).
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against La Touraine, Inc. by V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD.(Shayefar, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Shayefar added to party V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD(pty:dft) (anh).
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by La Touraine, Inc.. V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD served. (Wilton, Conrad). (jah).
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE [AO-120- Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark] by La Touraine, Inc. (Wilton, Conrad)(anh).
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by La Touraine, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Wilton, Conrad) QC Email Sent: No case number in the caption (anh).
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ivan Varko, V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11684787), filed by La Touraine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 Ex. A - H, #3 copyright form)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2160-BEN-NLS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Wilton, Conrad)(jrm) Modified to annotate Copyright Form Mailed 9/18/2018 (jrm). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: La Touraine, Inc. v. Varko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Touraine, Inc.
Represented By: Conrad Brently Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V.R.S. Virtual Reality Technology LTD
Represented By: Matthew Shayefar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Varko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?