The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd v. Aldi Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd
Defendant: Aldi Inc. and Fresh Source International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02196
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER granting #13 Second Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Fresh Source International, Inc. and Aldi Inc. must file answer to the #1 Complaint by 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/19/2018. (jah)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Fresh Source International, Inc. must file answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/16/2018. (jah)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fresh Source International, Inc. (Sweeney, Shannon) (acc).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Joint Motions for Extension of Time (Doc. Nos. #10 , #11 ). Defendant Fresh Source must file any response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 11/9/2018, and Defendant Aldi must file any response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/24/2018. (jdt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Aldi Inc.. (Wilton, Kenneth). Attorney Kenneth L. Wilton added to party Aldi Inc. (pty:dft). Modified on 10/16/2018 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected motion event and text (jah).
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Fresh Source International, Inc.. (Sweeney, Shannon). Modified on 10/15/2018 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected event and added link to Complaint (jah).
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald G. Rez on behalf of Fresh Source International, Inc. (Rez, Donald). Attorney Donald G. Rez added to party Fresh Source International, Inc.(pty:dft). (jah).
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon D Sweeney on behalf of Fresh Source International, Inc. (Sweeney, Shannon). Attorney Shannon D Sweeney added to party Fresh Source International, Inc. (pty:dft). (jah).
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd. All Defendants served. (Chung, Megan). (jah).
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest. Corporate Parent or Other Affiliate: Marlin Home, Coast2Coast Capital Group by The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd (Chung, Megan). Modified on 10/3/2018 - Edited text to add corporate affiliates (jah). (jao).
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Judge Larry Alan Burns has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2196 H (BGS).(no document attached) (jcj)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Amended REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *D505,815*, *D504,815*, *D527,218*, *D542,591* cc:USPTO (mme)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *D505,815*, *D527,218*, *D542,591* cc:USPTO (mme)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Aldi Inc., Fresh Source International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11705675.), filed by The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd.The new case number is 3:18-cv-02196-LAB-BGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Chung, Megan)(mme) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Copyright Report) Copyright Report mailed(mme). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd v. Aldi Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth L. Wilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh Source International, Inc.
Represented By: Donald G. Rez
Represented By: Shannon D Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Decor Corporation Pty Ltd
Represented By: Megan M. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?