Nelson v. The Coca-Cola Company
Plaintiff: Karen Nelson
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02225
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Fraser on behalf of Karen Nelson (Fraser, Michael)Attorney Michael Thomas Fraser added to party Karen Nelson(pty:pla) (dlg).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2225-GPC-MSB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/7/18.(dlg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen Nelson, as to The Coca-Cola Company. (Blood, Timothy) (dlg).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Minute ORDER: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this matter to another district judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned. The new case number is 18-cv-2225-GPC-AGS. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/1/2018. (no document attached) (smy)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Coca-Cola Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11718813), filed by Karen Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02225-H-AGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Blood, Timothy)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Nelson
Represented By: Timothy G. Blood
Represented By: Michael Thomas Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?