Brown v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Sandra Brown
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02286
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction for Claims Asserted by Non-California Residents by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #2 Declaration of Kate G. Hummel in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit A to the Hummel Declaration, #4 Request for Judicial Notice in Support Thereof)(Hummel, Kate) (sjm).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Starbucks Corporation answer due on 10/30/2018 is extended to 11/29/2018. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/29/2018. (sjm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Starbucks Corporation. (Hummel, Kate)Attorney Kate G Hummel added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft) (sjm).
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Houchin on behalf of Sandra Brown (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Houchin, Michael)Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Sandra Brown(pty:pla) (sjm).
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Brown. Starbucks Corporation served. (Marron, Ronald) (sjm).
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Brown. Sandra Brown served. (Marron, Ronald) (sjm).
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao).
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Starbucks Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11751196.), filed by Sandra Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02286-JM-WVG. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Marron, Ronald)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Kate G Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Brown
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?