Lucore et al v. U.S. Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Steven H. Lucore, Sr. and Judy L. Lucore
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Does 1 through 10 and U.S. Bank, NA
Case Number: 3:2018cv02293
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
3 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Judy L. Lucore, Steven H. Lucore, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Judy L. Lucore, Steven H. Lucore, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, John) (anh).
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of America, N.A., U.S. Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proof of Service)(Kornberg, Bernard)Attorney Bernard Kornberg added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Bernard Kornberg added to party U.S. Bank, NA(pty:dft) (anh).
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven H. Lucore, Sr, Judy L. Lucore, filed by Steven H. Lucore, Sr, Judy L. Lucore. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Mitchell, John) (anh).
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens Recorded by Judy L. Lucore, Steven H. Lucore, Sr (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, John) (anh).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/3/2018.(anh)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2293-BEN-AGS(anh)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Minute ORDER: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this matter to another district judge. This case is randomly reassign to Judge Roger T. Benitez for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this matter. The new case number is 18-cv-2293-BEN-NLS. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/9/2018. (no document attached) (smy)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao).
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Does 1 through 10, U.S. Bank, NA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11750429.), filed by Steven H. Lucore, Sr, Judy L. Lucore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2293-H-NLS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Mitchell, John)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucore et al v. U.S. Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Bernard Kornberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, NA
Represented By: Bernard Kornberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H. Lucore, Sr.
Represented By: John Kevin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy L. Lucore
Represented By: John Kevin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?