Sor Technology, LLC v. MWR Life, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sor Technology, LLC
Defendant: Yoni Ashurov, DOES 1-10 and MWR Life, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02358
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
2 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Venture LLP and by Stuart Craig Clark on behalf of Sor Technology, LLC (Clark, Stuart) (jpp).
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant's motion to dismiss is granted. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. (jpp) (jao).
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/28/2019. (jpp) (jao).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying #5 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/14/19. (dlg)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Nita L. Stormes, to the calendar of the Honorable Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Stormes, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Magistrate Allison H. Goddard. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 18CV2358-JLS(AHG). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/08/2019.(jpp)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Authority by Yoni Ashurov, MWR Life, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Supplement Authority - Fourth Estate Public Benefit Corp. v. Wall-Street.com, LLC, 586 U.S. ___ (2019))(Hutchison, Andrew) (jpp).
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Mark Hutchison on behalf of Yoni Ashurov, MWR Life, LLC (Hutchison, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Mark Hutchison added to party Yoni Ashurov(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Mark Hutchison added to party MWR Life, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER vacating hearing on #4 Motion to Dismiss set for 2/07/2019. The matter is taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/2019.(jpp)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Yoni Ashurov, MWR Life, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian D. Martin)(Gordon, Lawrence) (jpp).
January 21, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Sor Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart Clark)(Clark, Stuart) (jpp).
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Yoni Ashurov, MWR Life, LLC. (Gordon, Lawrence)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NON Opposition re #5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Sor Technology, LLC. (Clark, Stuart) (jpp).
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Matthew N. Horowitz, re #8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/14/2018. (mdc)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11999500.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Horowitz, Matthew)(jrd)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yoni Ashurov, MWR Life, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Gordon, Lawrence) (jpp).
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gordon, Lawrence) (dlg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Gordon, Lawrence) (dlg).
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Yoni Ashurov, MWR Life, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jonatan "Yoni" Ashurov, #3 Declaration of Brian D. Martin)(Gordon, Lawrence)Attorney Lawrence S. Gordon added to party MWR Life, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Copyright and Trade Dress Infringement, Aiding and Abetting, Money Owed, and Other Breaches of Contract by Yoni Ashurov.(Gordon, Lawrence)Attorney Lawrence S. Gordon added to party Yoni Ashurov(pty:dft) (jpp).
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Yoni Ashurov, DOES 1-10, MWR Life, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11783694), filed by Sor Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copyright Form)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02358-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Clark, Stuart)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sor Technology, LLC v. MWR Life, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoni Ashurov
Represented By: Andrew Mark Hutchison
Represented By: Lawrence S. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MWR Life, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Mark Hutchison
Represented By: Lawrence S. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sor Technology, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Craig Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?