Abbott v. Crossfit Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emily Abbott
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10 and Crossfit Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02364
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard R. Young, re #16 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/4/2018. (mdc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss -- Crossfit, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition, with Proof of Service filed by Crossfit Inc.. (Rychener, Brent) (ajs).
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11957698.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Young, Richard) (mdc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award, #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Emily Abbott. (Brandon, Lindsay) (ajs).
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Scott Brandon on behalf of Emily Abbott (Brandon, Lindsay)Attorney Lindsay Scott Brandon added to party Emily Abbott(pty:pla) (ajs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Emily Abbott. (Jacobs, Howard) (ajs).
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE to Withdraw Document by Emily Abbott re #11 Reply to Response to Motion (Jacobs, Howard) (ajs).
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN per (ECF No. #12 )*** REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Emily Abbott. (Jacobs, Howard) QC mailer sent re: document not signed. Atty to withdraw and refile (ajs). Modified on 11/14/2018 to withdraw document (ajs).
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Crossfit Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits A-B)(Rychener, Brent) (ajs).
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award Declaration Kurtis Bowler filed by Crossfit Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration and Exhibits A-D, #2 Proof of Service)(Rychener, Brent)(ajs).
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Crossfit Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Dailey, Colin) (ajs).
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brent E. Rychener, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/29/2018. (mdc)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jed P White on behalf of Crossfit Inc. (White, Jed)Attorney Jed P White added to party Crossfit Inc.(pty:dft) (ajs).
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin D Dailey on behalf of Crossfit Inc. (Dailey, Colin)Attorney Colin D Dailey added to party Crossfit Inc.(pty:dft) (ajs).
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11828001.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rychener, Brent) (mdc)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award by Emily Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #3 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #4 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #5 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #6 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #7 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #8 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #9 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #10 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #11 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #12 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #13 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #14 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs, #15 Exhibit to Declaration of Howard L. Jacobs)(Jacobs, Howard) (ajs).
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to vacate arbitration award against Crossfit Inc., Does 1 Through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11785158), filed by Emily Abbott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02364-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Jacobs, Howard)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott v. Crossfit Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossfit Inc.
Represented By: Richard Reynolds Young
Represented By: Brent Elwyn Rychener
Represented By: Colin D Dailey
Represented By: Jed P White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Abbott
Represented By: Howard Lee Jacobs
Represented By: Lindsay Scott Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?