Richner v. Senomyx, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Richner
Defendant: Dan Stebbins, Senomyx, Inc., Kent Snyder, John W. Poyhonen, Stephen A. Block, Tom Erdmann, Christopher Twomey and Mary Ann Gray
Case Number: 3:2018cv02383
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alfred Richner (Elkins, Joel) (acc).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge M. James Lorenz, Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-02336-BAS-WVG. The new case number is 18CV2383-BAS-WVG. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/29/2018. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/24/2018.(sjt)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Alfred Richner of case(s) 18-cv-02336 re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued . (Elkins, Joel) (QC mailer sent re: signature)(Low-number Order prepared) (sjt).
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Stephen A. Block, Tom Erdmann, Mary Ann Gray, John W. Poyhonen, Senomyx, Inc., Kent Snyder, Dan Stebbins, Christopher Twomey ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11802437.), filed by Alfred Richner. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02383-L-MDD. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Elkins, Joel)(jrm) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richner v. Senomyx, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senomyx, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Poyhonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Erdmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Twomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Richner
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?