HTC Corporation et al v. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson et al
Plaintiff: HTC America, Inc. and HTC Corporation
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson and Ericsson, Inc.
Undetermined: Qualcomm Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02427
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Dismissal (Dkt. #20 ). This action is dismissed without prejudice (Dkt. #20 ). All other pending motions are denied as moot. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/27/2018.(jdt) (sjt).
November 23, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HTC America, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (jdt).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18cv2427-LAB-MSB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/15/18. Motions set before Michael S. Berg.(dlg)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting HTC's Renewed Motion to Strike (ECF No. #12 ). The Court notes that a redacted version of the Motion to Compel has been filed (ECF No. 17) and grants Plaintiffs' renewed motion to strike. Accordingly, theCourt directs the Clerk of Court to strike Docket 1 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/30/2018. (jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2018: #1 Rejected Document) (jdt).
October 26, 2018 Filing 17 Redacted MOTION to Compel by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of HTC's Motion to Compel Qualcomm (with redacted ex), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(aef)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #10 HTC's Renewed Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/26/2018. (aef)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: The dates and requirements of the Order Setting Briefing Schedule issued on October 25, 2018 [ECF No. 9] remain in effect for HTCs Second Amended Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc [ECF No. 13]. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/26/18.(fk1)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 Amended MOTION Nunc Pro Tunc re #11 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Motion to Compel Qualcomm) by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Second Amended Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc)(Chiappetta, David) (jdt).
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike Document 1 Motion to Enforce Out of District Subpoena, Renewed by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chiappetta, David) (jdt).
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/26/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #10 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chiappetta, David) (aef). Modified on 10/29/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chiappetta, David) (aef).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF No. #7 ). On or before 10/30/2018, Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of its Amended Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc and this Order on Qualcomm, Inc. and all Defendants. Qualcomm, Inc. shall file its opposition on or before 11/26/2018. If Defendants want to file an opposition or other pleading, they must do so by 11/26/2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/25/2018.(jdt)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part HTC's Motion to Strike Dkt. 1 & 2 (ECF No. #4 ) and (2) Denying HTC's Motion to File Documents Under Seal (ECF No. #5 ). The Court denies Plaintiffs' motion to strike the Motion to Compel. However, the Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a renewed motion to strike after Plaintiffs have filed a redacted or amended Motion to Compel. The Court grants Plaintiffs motion to strike their Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc (ECF No. #2 ) and directs the Clerk's Office to strike the Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc from the record. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a renewed Motion to File Under Seal that corrects these deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/24/2018. (jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: #1 Rejected Document) (jdt).
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 Amended MOTION Nunc Pro Tunc re #5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Motion for Nunc Pro Tunc)(Chiappetta, David) QC email for attorney to withdraw incorrect filing (dlg).
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chiappetta, David) (dlg).
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chiappetta, David) (dlg).
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike Document 1 MOTION to Enforce Out of District Subpoena, 1 Motion to Enforce Out of District Subpoena, #2 MOTION FOR NUNC PRO TUNC by HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Chiappetta, David) Modified on 10/24/2018 - QC Email sent to file Proof of Service. (jdt).
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 1 MOTION to Enforce Out of District Subpoena: On or before 10/30/2018, Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of its motion and this Order on Qualcomm, Inc. and all Defendants. Qualcomm, Inc. shall file its opposition on or before 11/26/2018. If Defendants want to file an opposition or other pleading, they must do so by 11/26/2018. Plaintiffs shall file their reply on 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/23/2018.(jdt)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 *** Document is stricken from the record per court order dated 10/24/2018 (jdt).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 HTC's Motion to Compel Rule 45 Production and Rule 30(b)(6) Testimony from Qualcomm, Inc. (no document attached) (tcf) Modified text on 10/23/2018 (tcf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTC Corporation et al v. Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: David Chiappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation
Represented By: David Chiappetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Qualcomm Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?