Sevier et al v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB et al

Plaintiff: Michael Sevier and Linda Sevier
Defendant: Les Zieve, Esq., Seterus Finance, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP and Selene Finance, LP
Case Number: 3:2018cv02435
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jan M Adler
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:17-cv-02554-CAB-JMA. The new case number is 18CV2435-CAB(JMA).. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/10/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Linda Sevier, Michael Sevier. NUNC PRO TUNC 11/02/2018 (jpp)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Motion to Dismiss Not a Plaintiff in This Case, from Plaintiffs Linda Sevier, Michael Sevier. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 11/02/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/06/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE Bankruptcy Court case number 18-00020-LA13. Adversary Number 18-90052-LA. by Selene Finance, LP, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB, Les Zieve, Esq, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP. (no document attached)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevier et al v. Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Zieve, Esq.
Represented By: Jivko Filev Tchakarov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus Finance
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By: Jivko Filev Tchakarov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP
Represented By: Jivko Filev Tchakarov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance, LP
Represented By: Jivko Filev Tchakarov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sevier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sevier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?