Weyandt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William Henry Weyandt, II
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv02443
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405rs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for summary judgment on or before 2/8/2019. Defendant shall file and serve an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/13/2019. Plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the cross-motion and a reply to opposition on or before 3/27/2019. Defendant shall file any reply to opposition to the the cross-motion no later than 4/3/2019. A Motion Hearing is scheduled for 4/10/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 12/17/2018.(jdt)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD . (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Pages 1-45, #3 Pages 46-70, #4 Pages 71-149, #5 Pages 150-190, #6 Pages 191-264, #7 Pages 265-375, #8 Pages 376-513, #9 Pages 514-667, #10 Pages 668-709, #11 Pages 710-738, #12 Pages 739-797, #13 Pages 798-988, #14 Pages 989-1169, #15 Pages 1170-1306, #16 Pages 1307-1441, #17 Proof of Service)(Parker, Katherine) (jdt).
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Commissioner of Social Security.(Clark, Carol)Attorney Carol Sue Clark added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed by William Henry Weyandt, II re #2 Summons Issued 10/24/2018 (Cannon, Roy) Modified on 11/14/2018 - wrong event selected. Commissioner of Social Security served. Corrected title, noted service and sent QC email (jdt).
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lind Parker on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Parker, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Lind Parker added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft) (jdt).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER OF REFERRAL: All matters arising out of this social security appeal are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for a Report and Recommendation. The parties are instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Montenegros chambers with respect to all scheduling, hearing, or other issues. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/25/18. (no document attached) (rls)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf) (jao).
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11828687.), filed by William Henry Weyandt, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2443-LAB-RBM. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro are assigned to the case. (Cannon, Roy)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weyandt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Henry Weyandt, II
Represented By: Roy B Cannon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Katherine Lind Parker
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?