In Re: Return of Seized $12,047.00 in U.S. Currency
Petitioner: Jose Navarro
Respondent: United States of America
In Re: Return of Seized $12,047.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2018cv02483
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Return of Seized Property. The Court GRANTS Movant's unopposed Motion. Accordingly, the $12,047.00 in U.S. currency is to be returned to the Movant Jose Navarro, through his attorney of record, Richard M. Barnett. This concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk is instructed to close the file. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/6/2018. (acc) (sjt).
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Return of Seized Property filed by United States of America. (Smith, Bruce). (jah).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce C Smith on behalf of United States of America (Smith, Bruce)Attorney Bruce C Smith added to party United States of America(pty:res) (sjm).
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER re #2 MOTION for Return of Seized Property filed by Jose Navarro. Govt shall file opposition to the motion by 11/30/2018. Movant shall file reply by 12/7/2018. Court will take the MOTION for Return of Seized Property #2 under submission. No oral argument will be held unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/31/2018. (jah)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Return of Seized Property by Jose Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-V)(jrm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Return of Seized Property ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11844037.), filed by Jose Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-V, #3 civil cover sheet) Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Barnett, Richard)(jrm)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Return of Seized $12,047.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Bruce C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Navarro
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Return of Seized $12,047.00 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?