Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club of Southern California v. The Procter & Gamble Company et al
Plaintiff: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club of Southern California
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, The Procter & Gamble Company, Procter & Gamble RHD, Inc., The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02535
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (PCL): The parties' joint motion to continue the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ECF No. #11 ) is granted. The ENE and CMC are reset to March 14, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. The ENE statements and joint discovery plan are reset to March 7, 2019. The other dates will be reset to the parties' stipulated dates. Both plaintiff and defendants' representatives may appear at the continued hearings by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 01/03/2019. (no document attached) (mxa)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Walmart Inc.'s ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Walmart Inc..(Kohn, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Nicholas Kohn added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft) (jao).
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates and Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by The Procter & Gamble Company. (Leventhal, Joseph) (jao).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 12/12/2018.(jao)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club of Southern California. Walmart Inc. served. (Cary, Timothy) (jao).
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company Service of Chamber Rules (Leventhal, Joseph) (jao).
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, The Procter & Gamble Company.(Leventhal, Joseph) (jao).
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, The Procter & Gamble Company re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company . (Leventhal, Joseph) (jao).
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jao)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, Walmart Inc., filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club of Southern California.New Summons Requested. (Cary, Timothy) Mailer sent re address on 11/27/2018 (jao).
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 **Document Withdrawn** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6))(Cortez, Elvira)Attorney Elvira Cortez added to party The Procter & Gamble Company(pty:dft), Attorney Elvira Cortez added to party The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company(pty:dft) (jao).
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Parties With Financial Interest by The Procter & Gamble Company, The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company re #1 Notice of Removal. No Parties With Financial Interest. (cdw) (jao).
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of SD, case number 37-2018-00020509-CU-PO-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11870730), filed by The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, The Procter & Gamble Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02535-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club of Southern California v. The Procter & Gamble Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Joseph S. Leventhal
Represented By: Elvira Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble RHD, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Joseph S. Leventhal
Represented By: Elvira Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Nicholas Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club of Southern California
Represented By: Nathan R. Hurd
Represented By: Timothy E. Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?