Kelly v. City of Poway
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Kelly
Defendant: City of Poway
Case Number: 3:2018cv02615
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading. City of Poway response due 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by City of Poway. (Fenstermacher, Alan) (jpp).
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alan Brian Fenstermacher on behalf of City of Poway (Fenstermacher, Alan)Attorney Alan Brian Fenstermacher added to party City of Poway(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Poway, filed by Kevin T. Kelly. (jpp)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin T. Kelly, as to City of Poway. (aef)
November 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin T. Kelly. Andrew Wheeler served.(jpp)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin T. Kelly. Matthew G. Whitaker served(jpp)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (tcf) (jao).
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Poway ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS106653.), filed by Kevin T. Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Receipt)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2615-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Kelly, Kevin T.)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. City of Poway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Poway
Represented By: Alan Brian Fenstermacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?