Canizalez v. Nutrakey, LLC
Plaintiff: Adrian Canizalez
Defendant: Nutrakey, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02645
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adrian Canizalez. Nutrakey, LLC served. (Blatt, Gayle) (acc).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Joint Motion to Extend Nutrakey, LLC's Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion. Accordingly, Defendant has until 1/31/2019 to file an answer or otherwise contact the Court's law clerk to calendar a hearing date for a 12(b)(6) motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/2/2019. (acc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Nutrakey, LLC. (Stockinger, Trevor)Attorney Trevor V. Stockinger added to party Nutrakey, LLC(pty:dft) (acc).
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 PRO HAC APPROVED: Charles J. LaDuca appearing for Plaintiff Adrian Canizalez (no document attached) (jrd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 PRO HAC APPROVED: Beatrice Oluwayemisi Yakubu appearing for Plaintiff Adrian Canizalez (no document attached) (jrd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12025615.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(LaDuca, Charles)(jrd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12025586.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Yakubu, Beatrice)(jrd)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 PRO HAC APPROVED re #3 : Charles E. Schaffer appearing for Plaintiff Adrian Canizalez. (no document attached) (mdc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11982629.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schaffer, Charles) (mdc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Nutrakey, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11918358), filed by Adrian Canizalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-02645-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Blatt, Gayle)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canizalez v. Nutrakey, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrakey, LLC
Represented By: Trevor V. Stockinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Canizalez
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Beatrice Oluwayemisi Yakubu
Represented By: Charles E. Schaffer
Represented By: Charles J. LaDuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?