Hoffman v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Judith J. Hoffman
Defendant: David Miller, Richardson Griswold, Does 1-20 and City of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2018cv02654
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: John A Houston
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 bv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Joinder by City of San Diego, David Miller re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nelson, Jennifer) (jpp).
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) by City of San Diego, David Miller. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Nelson, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Lynn Nelson added to party City of San Diego(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Lynn Nelson added to party David Miller(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Richardson Griswold. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Griswold, Richardson)Attorney Richardson Craig Griswold added to party Richardson Griswold(pty:dft) (jpp).
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amended Complaint by Judith J. Hoffman. David Miller served. (dlg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Amended Complaint by Judith J. Hoffman. David Miller served. (dlg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to original Complaint by Judith J. Hoffman. David Miller served. (dlg)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to original Complaint by Judith J. Hoffman. Richardson Griswold served. (dlg)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal for all further proceedings. Judge Cynthia Bashant, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-00053-JAH-BGS. The new case number is 18cv2654-JAH-BGS. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge John Houston on 11/29/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jah)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Does 1-20, Richardson Griswold, David Miller, City of San Diego, filed by Judith J. Hoffman, City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 and 2, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-F, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) New Summons Requested. (jah)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (tcf) (jao).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-20, Richardson Griswold, David Miller ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS106801.), filed by Judith J. Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit s, #3 Receipt)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2654-BAS-JLB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Hoffman, Judith J.)(tcf) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoffman v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Miller
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson Griswold
Represented By: Richardson Craig Griswold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith J. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?