Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv02723
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Early Discovery. Plaintiff has established good cause and may serve a subpoena upon the ISP seeking only the true name and address of the individual identified. Plaintiff may not seek any further information without leave of Court, or propound any other discovery, and may not use the information gathered through the subpoena for any purpose except to identify and serve the proper defendant in the instant litigation. If the ISP seeks to quash the subpoena, it must do so before the subpoena's return date, which must be at least 45 days from service. In the event the subpoena is challenged, the ISP must preserve the data sought until that dispute is adjudicated. A copy of this order must be attached to and accompany the subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Marc L. Goldman on 12/12/2018. (rmc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (acc).
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (jao).
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (lrc) (jao).
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11957858.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Copyright Report)[Copyright Report Mailed]The new case number is 3:18-cv-2723-BAS-AGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(lrc) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?