Turner v. County of San Diego

Plaintiff: David Bryan Turner, Jr.
Defendant: County of San Diego
Case Number: 3:2019cv00030
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
0 Judge: Larry Alan Burns
1 Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331va
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER of Dismissal. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. No later than 21 calendar days from the date this order is issued, Turner must either pay the filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/8/2019.(jdt) (sjt).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of San Diego ( Filing fee due of $ 400.), filed by David Bryan Turner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00030-LAB-NLS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Turner, Jr, David Bryan)(mme)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bryan Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?