Gregory v. MTC Fiancial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: William S. Gregory
Defendant: DOES 3-20, inclusive, JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, MTC Fiancial Inc., Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, MB Default Ops Spec II, Clear Recon Corp and MTC Fiancial Inc. doing business as Trustee Corps
Case Number: 3:2019cv00055
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441oc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12(B)(6) by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed order)(Dharwarkar, Maya) emailed atty to email proposed order to chambers (ag).
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A (RJN), #4 Exhibit B (RJN), #5 Exhibit C (RJN), #6 Exhibit D (RJN), #7 Exhibit E (RJN), #8 Exhibit F (RJN), #9 Exhibit G (RJN), #10 Exhibit H( RJN), #11 Exhibit I (RJN)(Pomeroy, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Pomeroy added to party Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC(pty:dft) (ag).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC to Respond to Complaint. The date for Rushmore to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to 02/15/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/28/2019. (ajs)
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diala Debbas in Support of Motion to Extend Time)(Debbas, Diala)Attorney Diala G. Debbas added to party Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC(pty:dft) QC reminder email sent re: incorrect Judge in caption (ajs).
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint. The date for Chase to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (currently 01/16/2019) shall be extended by thirty (30) days to 02/15/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 01/14/2019. (ajs)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dharwarkar, Maya) QC reminder email sent re: incorrect Judge in caption and proposed order should not be attached (ajs).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-00055-WQH-KSC.(no document attached) (sjm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chae & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (mme) (jao).
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of CA, San Diego, case number 37-2018-00058535-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12073669.), filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-E, including State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration Mary Hass)The new case number is 3:19-cv-55-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. MTC Fiancial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 3-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Maya Dharwarkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Fiancial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Diala G. Debbas
Represented By: Timothy Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MB Default Ops Spec II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Fiancial Inc. doing business as Trustee Corps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Gregory
Represented By: Mohammad Oussama Maaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?