Krasne v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Mari-Ann Krasne
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00135
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Joint Motion to Dismiss. In light of the settlement, the parties are ordered to file their Joint Motion to Dismiss this case, signed by counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, no later than 4/18/2019. A proposed order granting the joint motion must be e-mailed to the assigned district judge's chambers on the same day. If the fully executed Joint Motion to Dismiss is not filed by 4/18/2019, then all counsel of record and unrepresented parties are required to appear in person for a Settlement Disposition Conference. The Settlement Disposition Conference will be held on 4/23/2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2C with Magistrate Judge Berg. If the parties file their Joint Motion to Dismiss on or before 4/18/2019, the Settlement Disposition Conference will be vacated without further court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 3/11/2019.(rmc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Mari-Ann Krasne (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Stennett, John) (rmc).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Second Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Upon due consideration, good cause appearing, the Court grants the parties' joint motion. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 3/12/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/25/2019. (rmc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel) Modified to correct event on 2/25/2019 (rmc).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 2/26/2019. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/6/2019. (rmc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maguire, Daniel)Attorney Daniel W. Maguire added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (rmc).
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mari-Ann Krasne. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Stennett, John) (rmc).
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12110556.), filed by Mari-Ann Krasne.The new case number is 3:19-cv-00135-MMA-MSB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Stennett, John)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasne v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Daniel W. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari-Ann Krasne
Represented By: John P. Stennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?