Mannis, M.D. et al v. American Board of Medical Specialties et al
Plaintiff: Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D. and Steve Mannis, M.D.
Defendant: Amerian Board of Anesthesiology, American Board of Medical Specialties and American Board of Emergency Medicine
Case Number: 3:2019cv00341
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Or To Transfer MOTION to Change Venue, from Defendants American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Standing Order for Civil Cases, M. James Lorenz failure to comply with order regarding motion briefing by multiple parties seeking same relief (see doc. no. 29). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/16/2019.(lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2019: #1 Rejected Document 31) (lrf).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Transfer MOTION to Change Venue, from Defendant Amerian Board of Anesthesiology. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 7.1(b) Motion hearing date not obtained by this party; Standing Order for Civil Cases, M. James Lorenz failure to comply with order regarding motion briefing by multiple parties seeking same relief (see doc. no. 31). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/16/2019.(lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2019: #1 Rejected Document 29) (lrf).
April 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest (No Parties with Financial Interest) by Amerian Board of Anesthesiology (McKnew, Natalma) Modified on 4/17/2019 (QC mailer sent re: wrong event selected)(sjt).
April 15, 2019 Filing 31 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #34 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Or To Transfer by American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of John D. Mandelbaum, # 3 Declaration Earl J. Reisdorff, # 4 Declaration Jack R. Biereg (Re: Coordinated Briefing))(Cart, Jean-Paul).(sjt). (Main Document 31 replaced on 4/16/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike on 4/16/2019 (lrf).
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Cart, Jean-Paul)
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #33 *** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Transfer by Amerian Board of Anesthesiology. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing on Motions, # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 3 Exhibit 1 (Opinion in Association of American Physicians & Surgeons, Inc. v. American Board of Medical Specialties))(McKnew, Natalma).(sjt). (Main Document 29 replaced on 4/16/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike on 4/16/2019 (lrf).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Natalma M. McKnew, re #17 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/21/2019. (mdc)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Maureen Demarest Murray (Re: Doc. No. #19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/21/2019.(jrd)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint. For good cause shown pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), Defendants' motion is granted. No later than 4/15/2019, Defendants shall file and serve their responses, if any, to the complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/18/2019. (lrf)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties. (Cart, Jean-Paul) Modified to correct event on 3/15/2019 (sjt).
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings for all Defendants (Unopposed), from Defendants American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Signature Certification does not meet requirements of Judge Lorenzs Standing Order for Civil Cases. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/14/2019.(lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2019: #1 Rejected Document 20) (lrf).
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny L. Dixon on behalf of Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. (Dixon, Jenny)Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Tonianne French, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Louis Lim, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Jenny L. Dixon added to party Steve Mannis, M.D.(pty:pla) (sjt).
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by George C Aguilar on behalf of Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. (Aguilar, George)Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Tonianne French, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Louis Lim, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney George C Aguilar added to party Steve Mannis, M.D.(pty:pla) (sjt).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jack R. Bierig (Re: Doc. No. #16 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/11/2019.(jrd)
March 13, 2019 Filing 20 *** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #24 *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings for all Defendants (Unopposed) by American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties. (Cart, Jean-Paul) Modified to remove proposed order on 3/14/2019 (sjt). (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/14/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike on 3/14/2019 (lrf).
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Murray, Maureen) (mdc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of John Shaeffer by John Shaeffer on behalf of Amerian Board of Anesthesiology (Shaeffer, John) (sjt).
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McKnew, Natalma) (mdc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12281938 Re: Doc. No. #15 )(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Bierig, Jack)(jrd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12281938.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bierig, Jack) 3/11/2019 - Sent QC e-mail to refile re missing signature. (mdc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 *** FILED IN ERROR; #12 PRO HAC VICE REQUEST PENDING *** - NOTICE of Appearance of Maureen Demarest Murray by John Shaeffer on behalf of Amerian Board of Anesthesiology (Shaeffer, John) Modified text on 3/11/2019 to indicate filing error. (mdc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 *** FILED IN ERROR; #11 PRO HAC VICE REQUEST PENDING *** - NOTICE of Appearance of Natalma M. McKnew by John Shaeffer on behalf of Amerian Board of Anesthesiology (Shaeffer, John)Attorney John Shaeffer added to party Amerian Board of Anesthesiology(pty:dft) Modified text on 3/11/2019 to indicate filing error. (mdc)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12279805.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Murray, Maureen)(QC Mailer; missing signature.)(jrd)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12279752.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(McKnew, Natalma)(QC Mailer; missing signature.)(jrd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Mannis, M.D., Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D.. American Board of Emergency Medicine served. (Mitchell, David) (sjt).
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Mannis, M.D., Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D.. American Board of Medical Specialties served. (Mitchell, David) (sjt).
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steve Mannis, M.D., Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D.. Amerian Board of Anesthesiology served. (Mitchell, David) (sjt).
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance Carmen A. Medici by Carmen A. Medici on behalf of Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Medici, Carmen)Attorney Carmen A. Medici added to party Tonianne French, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Carmen A. Medici added to party Louis Lim, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Carmen A. Medici added to party Steve Mannis, M.D.(pty:pla) (sjt).
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance Arthur L. Shingler III by Arthur L Shingler on behalf of Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shingler, Arthur)Attorney Arthur L Shingler added to party Tonianne French, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur L Shingler added to party Louis Lim, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney Arthur L Shingler added to party Steve Mannis, M.D.(pty:pla) (sjt).
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of David W. Mitchell by David William Mitchell on behalf of Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mitchell, David) (sjt).
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Mitchell, David)(sjt).
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D., Steve Mannis, M.D. of case(s) 2:18-cv-05260 (E.D. Pa.) . (Mitchell, David) (Low-number order not prepared, case in other Court) (sjt).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme) (jao).
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amerian Board of Anesthesiology, American Board of Emergency Medicine, American Board of Medical Specialties ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12215108.), filed by Steve Mannis, M.D., Tonianne French, M.D., Louis Lim, M.D..The new case number is 3:19-cv-00341-L-RBB. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Mitchell, David)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mannis, M.D. et al v. American Board of Medical Specialties et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonianne French, M.D.
Represented By: David William Mitchell
Represented By: George C Aguilar
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: Jenny L. Dixon
Represented By: Arthur L Shingler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Lim, M.D.
Represented By: David William Mitchell
Represented By: George C Aguilar
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: Jenny L. Dixon
Represented By: Arthur L Shingler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Mannis, M.D.
Represented By: David William Mitchell
Represented By: George C Aguilar
Represented By: Carmen A. Medici
Represented By: Jenny L. Dixon
Represented By: Arthur L Shingler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerian Board of Anesthesiology
Represented By: John Shaeffer
Represented By: Natalma M. McKnew
Represented By: Maureen Demarest Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Board of Medical Specialties
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Jean-Paul Phillip Cart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Board of Emergency Medicine
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Represented By: Jean-Paul Phillip Cart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?