In re Return of Seized 2006 Chevrolet
Petitioner: Leonel Leon
Respondent: United States of America
In Re: In Re Return of Seized 206 Chevrolet Silverado, VIN 1GCNCPEX6CZ320242
Case Number: 3:2019cv00401
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:3114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Leonel Leon. (Barnett, Richard)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE AND SETTING HEARING re #2 MOTION for Return of Seized Property : Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Respondent shall file a response to Movants motionby April 29, 2019. Movant shall file any reply by May 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/4/2019.(sjm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah R Bussell on behalf of United States of America (Bussell, Leah)Attorney Leah R Bussell added to party United States of America(pty:res) (sjm).
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Leonel Leon of case(s) 18cr1392 . (Barnett, Richard) (sjm).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Return of Seized Property by Leonel Leon. (Attachments: #1 Points & Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-G)(mme)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Return of Seized Property ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0947-12247185.), filed by Leonel Leon. (Attachments: #1 Points & Authorities in Support, #2 Exhibit A-G, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Barnett, Richard)(mme) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Return of Seized 2006 Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leonel Leon
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Leah R Bussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In Re Return of Seized 206 Chevrolet Silverado, VIN 1GCNCPEX6CZ320242
Represented By: Richard M Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?