Short v. California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan et al

Plaintiff: David Short
Defendant: California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan and Sharp Health Plan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00418
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE AND ORDER For (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/24/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2019 08:15 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/9/2019.(tcf)(jrd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roppo, Anna) (dlg). (jao).
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan, Sharp Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roppo, Anna) (dlg).
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION re NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roppo, Anna)Attorney Anna F Roppo added to party California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft) Changed event to motion. Attorney to submit proposed order. QC email sent(dlg).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Joint #9 Motion for Leave for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/27/19. (dlg)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sharp Health Plan identifying Corporate Parent Sharp Healthcare for Sharp Health Plan.. (Roppo, Anna) (dlg). (jao).
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Sharp Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roppo, Anna)Attorney Anna F Roppo added to party Sharp Health Plan(pty:dft) (dlg).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint #7 Motion for Leave for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time for the Defendant to respond to the Complaint filed by the Plaintiff is extended to and including April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/21/19. (dlg)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan. (Schechter, Marc)Attorney Marc S Schechter added to party California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan(pty:dft) (dlg).
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J Rozelle on behalf of David Short (Rozelle, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Rozelle added to party David Short(pty:pla) (dlg).
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Short. California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan served. (Rozelle, Timothy) (dlg).
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Short. Sharp Health Plan served. (Kantor, Lisa) (sjm).
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by David Short. No Parties With Financial Interest. (tcf)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan, Sharp Health Plan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12256488.), filed by David Short. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)The new case number is 3:19-cv-418-GPC-WVG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Kantor, Lisa)(tcf) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Short
Represented By: Lisa S Kantor
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Coast Credit Union Health & Welfare Plan
Represented By: Marc S Schechter
Represented By: Anna F Roppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Health Plan
Represented By: Anna F Roppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?