Weitsman et al v. Levesque
Plaintiff: Upstate Shredding, LLC and Adam Weitsman
Defendant: Robert Arthur Levesque, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00461
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332lb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0461-JLS-LL.(no document attached) (cdw)
March 11, 2019 Filing 71 Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez assigned to transfer case from Northern District of New York. (no document attached) (jpp)
March 11, 2019 Filing 70 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00727. Original file received electronically
February 22, 2019 Filing 69 Transcript Redaction Request re #67 Transcript,,,, by Richard S. Hartunian. (Hartunian, Richard) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION by Richard S. Hartunian re #67 Transcript,,,, (Hartunian, Richard) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Damages Hearing held on 6/1/2018 before Judge Mae A. D'Agostino, Court Reporter: Jacqueline Stroffolino, Telephone number: (518) 257-1894. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2019. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 2/5/2019 (jxs, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 66 RETURN RECEIPT received as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III re #65 Order Transferring Case. (dpk) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Case transferred to Southern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of California. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 1/11/2019. (Copy served via regular and certified)(ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 64 Letter Motion from Richard S. Hartunian for Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting an in-person conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Declaration of Catherine Johnson)(Hartunian, Richard) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION, #57 Letter Motion from Richard S. Hartunian for Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting a two-week adjournment of the September 7, 2018 return date and deadline to submit papers pursuant to the Court's August 27, 2018 Order to Show - Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law Re: Finding Personal Jurisdiction filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 62 Letter dated October 21, 2018 from Robert Arthur Levesque, III. (ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #59 Response to Order to Show Cause, #60 Response to Order to Show Cause,, (Katze, Samantha) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 60 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Hartunian, Richard) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 58 TEXT ORDER granting #57 Letter Request for an extension of time for Plaintiff's to submit a response to #54 Order to Show Cause: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs show cause, if there be any, why the Court should not dismiss this matter for lack of personal jurisdiction or transfer venue to the appropriate district court in California having personal jurisdiction over Defendant; and the Court further ORDERS that #57 Plaintiff's request for a two week extension of time to submit a response to #54 Order to Show Cause, is GRANTED; Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before 9/21/18. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. No personal appearances are necessary. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/6/2018. (Copy served via regular mail on defendant)(ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 57 Letter Motion from Richard S. Hartunian for Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting a two-week adjournment of the September 7, 2018 return date and deadline to submit papers pursuant to the Court's August 27, 2018 Order to Show Cause submitted to Judge Mae A. DAgostino . (Hartunian, Richard) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha J. Katze on behalf of Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman (Katze, Samantha) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Hartunian on behalf of Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman (Hartunian, Richard) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs show cause, if there be any, to this Court by submission on papers as ordered herein, before the Honorable Mae A. D'Agostino, United States District Court Judge at the United States Courthouse, 445 Broadway, Albany, New York, why the Court should not dismiss this matter for lack of personal jurisdiction or transfer venue to the appropriate district court in California having personal jurisdiction over Defendant; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' submissions shall be filed on or before September 7, 2018; and the Court further ORDERS that no personal appearance is required the papers will be taken on submission unless otherwise directed by the Court; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 08/27/2018. (Copy served via regular mail)(bto) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #52 Notice (Other) - Notice of Service of Subpoena - Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman Notice of Issuance of Subpoena - Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #48 Notice (Other) - Notice of Service of Subpoena - Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #49 Notice (Other) Notice of Service of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman - Notice of Issuance of Subpoena to Twitter, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman - Notice of Issuance of Subpoena to Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 23, 2018 TEXT NOTICE re #46 Supplemental MOTION for Contempt, #43 MOTION Contempt Order alternatively Order to Show Cause: The Motion Hearing regarding the #43 #46 Motions for Contempt, is set for 8/7/2018 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. The motions will be decided on the submission of the papers only. No personal appearances are necessary. Response papers, if any, are due on or before 7/23/18. (ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #46 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR CONTEMPT by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #43 MOTION Contempt Order alternatively Order to Show Cause re #34 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Supplement to Motion in Support of an Order of Contempt - (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) Modified on 7/19/2018 (ban). [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 45 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order of Contempt and/or Alternative Motion for Show Cause Hearing on Why an Order of Contempt Should Not Be Entered [ served on Robert Arthur Levesque, III on 07/12/2018, filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #43 MOTION Contempt Order alternatively Order to Show Cause re #34 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION Contempt Order alternatively Order to Show Cause re #34 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2018 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 7/23/2018 filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Motion for an Order of Contempt - Alternatively Motion for Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 42 Witness List from June 1, 2018 Damages Hearing.(ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
June 1, 2018 Filing 41 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing re Damages held on 6/1/2018 re #25 MOTION for Default Judgment before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Raeesabbas Mohamed, Esq. and Daniel Warner, Esq. for the Plaintiff; No Appearance by defendant Robert Levesque; Testimony is entered. A written decision will be entered. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino, CRD Britney Norton) (ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 40 RETURN RECEIPT: received as to the Text Notice filed on 4/27/2018 served on Robert Arthur Levesque, III via certified mail on 5/25/2018. Article No. 7015 3010 0001 4974 8909. (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #38 Notice (Other) - Certificate of Service of Plaintiffs' Amended List of Witnesses and Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #36 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Amended List of Witnesses and Exhibits (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #36 Notice (Other) - Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman Plaintiffs' List of Witnesses and Exhibits (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 35 RETURN RECEIPT: received as to the #34 Memorandum-Decision and Order served on Robert Arthur Levesque, III via certified mail on 5/16/18. Article No. 7015 3010 0001 4974 8640. (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Set Deadlines: Exhibit and Witness Lists, if any, due by 5/25/2018. (ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
April 27, 2018 TEXT NOTICE of Damages Hearing: A Damages Hearing is set for 6/1/2018 at 09:30 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. Witness and Exhibit Lists, if any, shall be filed on or before 5/25/18. (copy mailed to pro se defendant via regular mail)(ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 34 **VACATED Pursuant to Judge D'Agostino's 1/11/19 Memorandum-Decision and Order**MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part #25 Motion for Default Judgment; finding as moot #29 Motion to Strike: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against Defendant (Dkt. No. 25) is GRANTED IN PART as to liability for the defamation claim, pending a hearing on damages; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' business disparagement/trade libel, tortious interference, and intentional infliction of emotional distress claims are DISMISSED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Robert Arthur Levesque, III is hereby restrained and enjoined from publishing on the internet, or causing the publication of, any of the following false and defamatory statements, whether directly or indirectly, about Plaintiffs Adam Weitsman and/or Upstate Shredding: (1) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding is a "murderer;" (2) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding conspired to murder Michele Harris; (3) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding assisted, helped, and/or aided Calvin Harris or any other person in disposing of Michele Harris' body; (4) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding conspired, assisted, helped, and/or aided in the murder of Michele Harris; (5) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding was paid money by Calvin Harris or any other person in connection with the murder or disappearance of Michele Harris; (6) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding conspired, assisted, helped, and/or aided Calvin Harris or any other person from being found guilty, convicted, arrested, detained, liable, responsible, and/or suspected of murdering Michele Harris; (7) that Plaintiff Upstate Shredding or any of its equipment was used to dispose of Michele Harris' body; (8) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding was involved in the disappearance of Michele Harris; (9) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding sold or sells illegal drugs; (10) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding is or has been involved with Joaquin "El Chapo" Guzman; (11) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding engaged or engages in money laundering; (12) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding bribes or has bribed one or more government officials; (13) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding is or has been involved with covering up the death of Michael Burke; and (14) that Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding fooled the Environmental Protection Agency ("EPA") by removing two feet of contaminated soil at the Jamestown Yard; and the Court further ORDERS that, within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Memorandum-Decision and Order, Defendant shall remove from all websites, forums, blogs, lists, social media accounts, and any other forum of mass communication (collectively "Forums") all defamatory statement pertaining to Plaintiffs Weitsman or Upstate Shredding; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk shall schedule a damages inquest at the earliest convenience of the parties; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 29) is DENIED as moot; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/25/2018. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(ban) Modified on 1/11/2019 (ban, ). [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
February 5, 2018 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER denying #31 Pre-Motion Letter by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman: It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs request for leave to file a motion for immediate preliminary and permanent injunctive relief against the defendant is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the decision on #25 plaintiffs motion for Default Judgment and injunctive relief will be expedited by this Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/5/2018. (ban) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #31 Pre-Motion Letter by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 19, 2018 Filing 31 Pre-Motion Letter by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 1/22/2018 (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #29 Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Default Judgment AND Motion to Strike Defendant's Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 5, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III AND MOTION TO STRIKE Defendant's Response filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam Weitsman)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) Modified on 1/8/2018 to reflect that this filing also contains a Motion to Strike. (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 3, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion. Replaced Response with a copy that is readable. A complete copy of Exhibit A was replaced. (khr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 3, 2018 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS (Exhibit C) by Robert Arthur Levesque, III re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(khr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding the #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III filed by Robert Arthur Levesque, III, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit of Service)[The Clerk notes that there was not a page 14 included with Exhibit A.](mc) (Main Document 27 replaced on 1/3/2018) (khr, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/3/2018) (khr, ). [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2018 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 1/2/2018 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/5/2018. filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER : According to the docket sheet, clerk's entry of default has been entered against the sole defendant in this action, Robert Arthur Levesque, III. Plaintiffs' counsel may file a motion for default judgment on or before 12/6/2017. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 11/6/2017. (Copy served upon defendant via regular mail). (sal ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 23 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT: as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III. APPROVING the #17 Request for Entry of Default. [Copy served upon pro se defendant via regular mail.] (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
November 3, 2017 Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (ban) Modified on 11/3/2017 - copy mailed to non-ecf parties, along with a copy of Judge D'Agostino's individual rules(ban). [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: It is ORDERED that this case has been reassigned to U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr no longer assigned to case. The case will remain assigned to the Honorable David E. Peebles, U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/31/2017. [Copy served upon pro se defendant via regular mail.](mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 20 PRO SE HANDBOOK, LOCAL RULES, LAWYER REFERRAL SERVICES, AND NOTICE issued to the defendant by regular mail. (sal ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Robert Warner, Esq. for Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 10/27/2017. (sal ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Defendant Robert Levesque called Magistrate Judge Peebles Chambers inquiring into the request for clerk's entry of default filed. He advised that he will be sending in a request for an extension of time to file an answer to plaintiffs' complaint. Defendant's contact information has been added to the docket sheet and the clerk will provide the defendant with a Pro Se Handbook, Local Rules, and Lawyer Referral Services. Magistrate Judge Peebles has been advised of this information, as well as the #17 request for clerk's entry of default that is pending. (Served defendant Levesque by regular mail). (sal) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #17 Request for Entry of Default, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III re #1 Complaint, Plaintiffs' Application for Entry of Default by Adam Weitsman, Upstate Shredding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Application for Entry of Default)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Robert Warner Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-4176980. filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Oath on Admission, #4 New Atty EFiling, #5 Order) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (Curtin, Patricia) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re Set/Reset Answer Deadline, #13 Certificate of Service - Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #2 Summons Issued, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Complaint, 11 Order, 8 Order on Letter Request,,, #12 Certificate of Service, 10 Order on Letter Request,, and General Order #47 - Amended Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re Set/Reset Answer Deadline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 4, 2017 ***Answer for Robert Arthur Levesque, III due 10/23/2017. (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 2, 2017 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman re #2 Summons Issued, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Complaint, 11 Order, 8 Order on Letter Request,,, 10 Order on Letter Request,, and General Order #47 Upon Defendant Robert Arthur Levesque, III via email (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER : The in person Rule 16 Conference set for 11/3/2017 at 11:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles is adjourned without date at this time. The deadline for the filing of the Civil Case Management and exchange of mandatory disclosures is stayed. Once a formal appearance has been made on behalf of the defendant, the Rule 16 Conference will be rescheduled. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 10/2/2017. (sal ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Permission is hereby granted pursuant to Rule 4(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Section 308(5) of the New York Civil Practice Law and Rules to serve the defendant in this action by e-mail. The e-mail service, in combination with the "drop service" effectuated on September 21, 2017, shall be deemed good and sufficient service upon sending of the summons and complaint by e-mail. Defendant shall have twenty-one days from the date on which the e-mail was sent to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on October 2, 2017. (all, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 28, 2017 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Plaintiffs Attorney, Raeesabbas Mohamed for Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman requesting Order Authorizing Alternative Service or deeming prior service valid submitted to Judge David E. Peebles . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER : The court construes plaintiffs' #7 letter as a request for an extension of time to serve the summons and complaint upon the defendant on or before 10/2/2017, which is GRANTED. The IN PERSON Initial Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 10:30 AM is rescheduled, however, the date this conference is rescheduled for is 11/3/2017 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/31/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for advising the defendant of this change once service has been effectuated. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 9/5/2017. (sal) (sal, ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
September 5, 2017 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Raeesabbas Mohamed, co-counsel for Plaintiff, admitted Pro Hac Vice for Adam Weitsman requesting Continuance of Rule 16 Conference . (Mohamed, Raeesabbas) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
August 17, 2017 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Due to a conflict with Magistrate Judge Peebles' schedule, the in person Initial Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 10:30 AM is rescheduled for 10/20/2017 at 10:30 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/13/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Plaintiffs' counsel is responsible for advising the defendant of this change once he formally appears in this action. (sal) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raeesabbas Mohamed, Esq. for Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 7/13/2017. (sal) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Raeesabbas Mohamed Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-4065137. filed by Upstate Shredding, LLC, Adam Weitsman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment, #2 Affidavit, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Attorney E-filing Registration Form, #5 Oath of Admission, #6 Certificate Good Standing) Motions referred to David E. Peebles. (Curtin, Patricia) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Plaintiffs Adam Weitsman and Upstate Shredding, LLC; Attorney Raees Mohamed, Email address is raees@kellywarnerlaw.com. Phone number is 480-331-9397. Admissions due by 7/21/2017. [Copy sent to Attorney Raees Mohamed via regular mail.] (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 10/6/2017 at 10:30 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/29/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 7, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert Arthur Levesque, III. (mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: against Robert Arthur Levesque, III (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0206-4058862) filed by Adam Weitsman and Upstate Shredding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defamatory Statements by Defendant, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Twitter Posting FindLaw Research, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant Twitter Post, #4 Exhibit D - Defendant Twitter Post Re Plaintiff Demand, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(mc) [Transferred from New York Northern on 3/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weitsman et al v. Levesque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Arthur Levesque, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upstate Shredding, LLC
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Represented By: Richard S. Hartunian
Represented By: Daniel R. Warner
Represented By: Patricia M. Curtin
Represented By: Samantha J. Katze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Weitsman
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Represented By: Richard S. Hartunian
Represented By: Daniel R. Warner
Represented By: Patricia M. Curtin
Represented By: Samantha J. Katze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?