Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust et al v. Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Andrew McKercher, Andy Berg and Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust
Defendant: Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00474
Filed: March 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
2 Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust, Andy Berg, and Andrew McKercher; and against Defendant Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc., in the amount of $391,729.71, and pursuant to the terms of the stipulation attached as Exhibit 1 hereto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(rmc) (sjt).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Judgment Pursuant to #6 The Parties' Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. Pursuant to a stipulation entered into by and among the parties, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that Judgment is entered in this action according to the stipulation attached as Exhibit 1 to this Order. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter a separate Clerk's judgment accordingly and to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (rmc)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Entry of Clerk Default Judgment against Defendant Sullivan Solar Power of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Do, Tino) Modified on 5/23/2019 to Motion for Judgment solely for logistical purpose of docketing order thereon (rmc).
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust, Andrew McKercher, Andy Berg. Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc. served. (Do, Tino) (rmc).
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Michael M. Anello for all further proceedings. The new case number is 3:19-cv-00474-MMA-BLM.(no document attached) (jrm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Andy Berg, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Andrew McKercher (Do, Tino) Modified on 3/25/2019, cites interested parties but does not list them (jao).
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12291063), filed by Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust, Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust, Andrew McKercher, Andy Berg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00474-W-BLM. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Do, Tino)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust et al v. Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Pension Trust
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew McKercher
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Berg
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the San Diego Electrical Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Tino Xuan Do
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sullivan Solar Power of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?