Crooks v. CMRE Financial Services Inc.

Plaintiff: Jeremy Crooks
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00529
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion to Continue ENE and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2019 is continued to 9/27/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. All other provisions of the 5/21/2019 Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/27/2019. (jah)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Jeremy Crooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana). (jah).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Continue ENE Conference by CMRE Financial Services Inc.. (Kaminski, David). Attorney David J Kaminski added to party CMRE Financial Services Inc. (pty:dft) . (jah).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/8/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed by 6/10/2019. Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed in CM/ECF as well as lodged with Magistrate Judge Skomal by 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/21/2019. (jah)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CMRE Financial Services Inc..(Schannong, Martin). Attorney Martin Schannong added to party CMRE Financial Services Inc.(pty:dft). (jah).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel G. Shay (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel). (jah).
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Jeremy Crooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Jeremy Crooks(pty:pla) (aef).
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Swigart on behalf of Jeremy Crooks (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swigart, Joshua)Attorney Joshua B. Swigart added to party Jeremy Crooks(pty:pla) (aef).
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeremy Crooks, as to CMRE Financial Services Inc.. (Hart, Yana). (jah).
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Jeremy Crooks (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel). Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Jeremy Crooks(pty:pla). (jah).
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (als)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CMRE Financial Services Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12320734.), filed by Jeremy Crooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-00529-H-BGS. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(als) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crooks v. CMRE Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Crooks
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Represented By: Martin Schannong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?