Cooper v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Michael Cooper
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00560
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE"). The ENE set for 7/9/2019 at 2:30p.m. is continued to 8/22/2019 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall refer to the Court's Chambers Rules for the Court's requirements regarding attendance and participation in the ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/25/2019. (no document attached) (kxb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsui, Karen) (acc).
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/9/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/28/2019.(acc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Life Insurance Company of North America . Identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Tsui, Karen) (tcf). (jao).
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tsui, Karen) (tcf).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America will have an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint to and including, 5/22/2019. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/16/2019. (acc)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Tsui, Karen)Attorney Karen T. Tsui added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) Modified on 4/16/2019 to correct event type(acc).
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Cooper. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Wolken, Freyja) (acc).
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv0560-AJB-KSC.(no document attached) (jao)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12344757.), filed by Michael Cooper. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-560-W-KSC. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Wolken, Freyja)(jrm)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Karen T. Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cooper
Represented By: Freyja Lilian Wolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?